This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/12/2022 at 06:40:33 (UTC).

SILVIA MONROY VS. BARONHR WEST, INC.

Case Summary

On 11/30/2021 SILVIA MONROY filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against BARONHR WEST, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Silvia Monroy

Defendants

BaronHR West, Inc.

Tilly's, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Law Offices of Farrah Mirabel

Defendant Attorneys

BaronHR LLC

Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY MONROY, SILVIA ON 11/30/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY MONROY, SILVIA ON 11/30/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MONROY, SILVIA ON 11/30/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MONROY, SILVIA ON 11/30/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12977068 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12804987.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12977068 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12804987.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/04/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C42 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/04/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C42 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MONROY, SILVIA ON 12/03/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MONROY, SILVIA ON 12/03/2021

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY BARONHR WEST, INC. ON 01/13/2022

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY BARONHR WEST, INC. ON 01/13/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12994996 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12822909.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12994996 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12822909.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY TILLY'S, INC. ON 01/18/2022

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY TILLY'S, INC. ON 01/18/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12995557 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12823476.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12995557 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12823476.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2022
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: HOFFER; Department: C42

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12995557 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12823476.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY TILLY'S, INC. ON 01/18/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21111229 RECEIVED ON 01/18/2022 09:14:43 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12994996 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12822909.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1939419 RECEIVED ON 01/13/2022 05:24:55 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY BARONHR WEST, INC. ON 01/13/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31093018 RECEIVED ON 12/03/2021 08:28:16 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MONROY, SILVIA ON 12/03/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/04/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C42 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12977068 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12804987.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1923650 RECEIVED ON 11/30/2021 07:47:28 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HOFFER, DAVID ON 11/30/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MONROY, SILVIA ON 11/30/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY MONROY, SILVIA ON 11/30/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TILLYS INC AKA is a litigant

Latest cases where BaronHR West, Inc., a corporation is a litigant