This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/14/2022 at 07:24:14 (UTC).

SIAMACK SALIMITARI VS. R.J.M.S. ENTERPRISES INC.

Case Summary

On 03/15/2021 SIAMACK SALIMITARI filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against R J M S ENTERPRISES INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Claimant and Plaintiff

SIAMACK SALIMITARI

Defendants

MARIO MARTINEZ

R.J.M.S. Enterprises Inc.

Provenza Floors, Inc.

Hardwood Galleria, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Claimant and Plaintiff Attorney

Justice Attorney Group, APC

Defendant Attorney

Mirhossseini Law Group, APC

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY SALIMITARI, SIAMACK ON 03/15/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY SALIMITARI, SIAMACK ON 03/15/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SALIMITARI, SIAMACK ON 03/15/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SALIMITARI, SIAMACK ON 03/15/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12858579 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12686298.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12858579 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12686298.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41170186 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41170186 REJECTED.

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY SALIMITARI, SIAMACK ON 04/05/2021

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY SALIMITARI, SIAMACK ON 04/05/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SALIMITARI, SIAMACK ON 04/05/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SALIMITARI, SIAMACK ON 04/05/2021

JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 06/20/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C22 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 06/20/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C22 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY HARDWOOD GALLERIA, INC.; MARTINEZ, MARIO; PROVENZA FLOORS, INC.; R.J.M.S. ENTERPRISES INC. ON 05/18/2021

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY HARDWOOD GALLERIA, INC.; MARTINEZ, MARIO; PROVENZA FLOORS, INC.; R.J.M.S. ENTERPRISES INC. ON 05/18/2021

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31034691 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31034691 REJECTED.

ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY HARDWOOD GALLERIA, INC.; PROVENZA FLOORS, INC.; R.J.M.S. ENTERPRISES INC. ON 07/14/2021

ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY HARDWOOD GALLERIA, INC.; PROVENZA FLOORS, INC.; R.J.M.S. ENTERPRISES INC. ON 07/14/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,305.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12914003 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12741875.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,305.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12914003 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12741875.

NOTICE OF RELOCATION

NOTICE OF RELOCATION

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2022
  • HearingDescription: JURY TRIAL; Judge: SALTER; Department: N06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELOCATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,305.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12914003 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12741875.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41216716 RECEIVED ON 07/14/2021 03:57:29 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY HARDWOOD GALLERIA, INC.; PROVENZA FLOORS, INC.; R.J.M.S. ENTERPRISES INC. ON 07/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31034691 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21019729 RECEIVED ON 05/18/2021 10:32:01 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY HARDWOOD GALLERIA, INC.; MARTINEZ, MARIO; PROVENZA FLOORS, INC.; R.J.M.S. ENTERPRISES INC. ON 05/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 06/20/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C22 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1831114 RECEIVED ON 04/05/2021 10:39:51 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SALIMITARI, SIAMACK ON 04/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY SALIMITARI, SIAMACK ON 04/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41170186 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12858579 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12686298.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1822288 RECEIVED ON 03/15/2021 03:31:20 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SALTER, GLENN ON 03/15/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SALIMITARI, SIAMACK ON 03/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY SALIMITARI, SIAMACK ON 03/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where R.J.M.S. Enterprises Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Provenza Floors, Inc. is a litigant