This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 12/08/2021 at 11:45:07 (UTC).

SIALIC CONTRACTORS CORPORATION VS. CITY OF ANAHEIM

Case Summary

On 11/16/2020 SIALIC CONTRACTORS CORPORATION filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against CITY OF ANAHEIM. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Joseph Gilbert Jimenez

Sialic Contractors Corporation

Respondent

City of Anaheim

Intervenor

Los Angeles/Orange County Building and Construction Trades Council

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Intervenor Attorneys

Jamison Chappel & Beaumont

Law Offices of Ray Van Der Nat, APC

The Myers Law Group, A.P.C.

Respondent Attorney

Anaheim City Attorney's Office

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY SIALIC CONTRACTORS CORPORATION ON 11/04/2021

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY SIALIC CONTRACTORS CORPORATION ON 11/04/2021

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY SIALIC CONTRACTORS CORPORATION ON 11/03/2021

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY SIALIC CONTRACTORS CORPORATION ON 11/03/2021

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION 02/26/2021 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION 02/26/2021 09:00:00 AM.

RESPONSE FILED BY LOS ANGELES/ORANGE COUNTY BUILDING AND CONSTRUCTION TRADES COUNCIL ON 02/11/2021

RESPONSE FILED BY LOS ANGELES/ORANGE COUNTY BUILDING AND CONSTRUCTION TRADES COUNCIL ON 02/11/2021

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY JIMENEZ, JOSEPH GILBERT; SIALIC CONTRACTORS CORPORATION ON 02/10/2021

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY JIMENEZ, JOSEPH GILBERT; SIALIC CONTRACTORS CORPORATION ON 02/10/2021

SUPPLEMENTAL FILED BY JIMENEZ, JOSEPH GILBERT; SIALIC CONTRACTORS CORPORATION ON 02/10/2021

SUPPLEMENTAL FILED BY JIMENEZ, JOSEPH GILBERT; SIALIC CONTRACTORS CORPORATION ON 02/10/2021

SUPPLEMENTAL FILED BY CITY OF ANAHEIM ON 02/10/2021

SUPPLEMENTAL FILED BY CITY OF ANAHEIM ON 02/10/2021

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION 02/05/2021 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION 02/05/2021 09:00:00 AM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12839367 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12666886.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12839367 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12666886.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (ANSWER IN INTERVENTION) FILED BY LOS ANGELES/ORANGE COUNTY BUILDING AND CONSTRUCTION TRADES COUNCIL ON 01/25/2021

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (ANSWER IN INTERVENTION) FILED BY LOS ANGELES/ORANGE COUNTY BUILDING AND CONSTRUCTION TRADES COUNCIL ON 01/25/2021

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY JIMENEZ, JOSEPH GILBERT; SIALIC CONTRACTORS CORPORATION ON 01/29/2021

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY JIMENEZ, JOSEPH GILBERT; SIALIC CONTRACTORS CORPORATION ON 01/29/2021

OBJECTION FILED BY JIMENEZ, JOSEPH GILBERT; SIALIC CONTRACTORS CORPORATION ON 01/29/2021

OBJECTION FILED BY JIMENEZ, JOSEPH GILBERT; SIALIC CONTRACTORS CORPORATION ON 01/29/2021

REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY JIMENEZ, JOSEPH GILBERT; SIALIC CONTRACTORS CORPORATION ON 01/29/2021

REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY JIMENEZ, JOSEPH GILBERT; SIALIC CONTRACTORS CORPORATION ON 01/29/2021

ORDER - OTHER FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 01/27/2021

ORDER - OTHER FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 01/27/2021

OPPOSITION FILED BY CITY OF ANAHEIM ON 01/26/2021

OPPOSITION FILED BY CITY OF ANAHEIM ON 01/26/2021

RESPONSE FILED BY CITY OF ANAHEIM ON 01/26/2021

RESPONSE FILED BY CITY OF ANAHEIM ON 01/26/2021

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 01/22/2021 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 01/22/2021 08:30:00 AM.

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER (FOR AN ORDER ALLOWING PROPOSED INTERVENOR/RESPONDENT TRADES COUNCIL TO INTERVENE) FILED BY SIALIC CONTRACTORS CORPORATION ON 01/20/2021

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER (FOR AN ORDER ALLOWING PROPOSED INTERVENOR/RESPONDENT TRADES COUNCIL TO INTERVENE) FILED BY SIALIC CONTRACTORS CORPORATION ON 01/20/2021

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY SIALIC CONTRACTORS CORPORATION ON 11/04/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31082753 RECEIVED ON 11/04/2021 04:04:48 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21084814 RECEIVED ON 11/03/2021 01:10:16 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY SIALIC CONTRACTORS CORPORATION ON 11/03/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION 02/26/2021 09:00:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE FILED BY LOS ANGELES/ORANGE COUNTY BUILDING AND CONSTRUCTION TRADES COUNCIL ON 02/11/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2983502 RECEIVED ON 02/11/2021 12:19:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY JIMENEZ, JOSEPH GILBERT; SIALIC CONTRACTORS CORPORATION ON 02/10/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
63 More Docket Entries
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY JIMENEZ, JOSEPH GILBERT; SIALIC CONTRACTORS CORPORATION ON 11/18/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY JIMENEZ, JOSEPH GILBERT; SIALIC CONTRACTORS CORPORATION ON 11/18/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY JIMENEZ, JOSEPH GILBERT; SIALIC CONTRACTORS CORPORATION ON 11/18/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY JIMENEZ, JOSEPH GILBERT; SIALIC CONTRACTORS CORPORATION ON 11/18/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2959164 RECEIVED ON 11/18/2020 09:29:11 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12809241 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12636360.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41133231 RECEIVED ON 11/16/2020 03:12:03 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MOSS, ROBERT ON 11/16/2020.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SIALIC CONTRACTORS CORPORATION; JIMENEZ, JOSEPH GILBERT ON 11/16/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE FILED BY SIALIC CONTRACTORS CORPORATION; JIMENEZ, JOSEPH GILBERT ON 11/16/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Los Angeles/Orange County Building and Construction Trades Council, AFL-CIO is a litigant

Latest cases where SIALIC CONTRACTORS CORPORATION is a litigant