Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/17/2021 at 10:19:59 (UTC).

SHU-LIANG KUO VS FRANCES KUO

Case Summary

On 02/02/2021 SHU-LIANG KUO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against FRANCES KUO. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0614

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Kuo, Shu-Liang

Respondents

Kuo, Frances J.

KUO, FRANCES J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

THE AMIN LAW GROUP LTD

Respondent Attorney

SEASTROM TUTTLE & MURPHY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketINCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 04/01/2021 Income & Expense Declaration; Filing Party: KUO, SHU-LIANG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketDECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 04/01/2021 Declaration - Service Of Declaration Of Disclosure; Filing Party: KUO, SHU-LIANG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 03/22/2021; Filing Party: KUO, SHU-LIANG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE & ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT 03/22/2021; Filing Party: KUO, SHU-LIANG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCONFIDENTIAL - PARTY ID - RELATED CASE - UPDATE PARTY 03/15/2021; Filing Party: KUO, FRANCES J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketDECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 03/15/2021; Filing Party: KUO, FRANCES J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 03/15/2021; Filing Party: KUO, FRANCES J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE - ELECTRONIC 03/15/2021; Filing Party: KUO, FRANCES J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketNOTICE - RELATED CASE - UPDATE PARTY 02/02/2021; Filing Party: KUO, SHU-LIANG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketDECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 02/02/2021; Filing Party: KUO, SHU-LIANG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketPETITION - DISSOLUTION 02/02/2021; Filing Party: KUO, SHU-LIANG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS 02/02/2021; Filing Party: KUO, SHU-LIANG

    Read MoreRead Less