This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/29/2022 at 06:40:39 (UTC).

SHERRY LYNETTE MILLER MARTINEZ VS. CHRISTOPHER SEAN SHILEY

Case Summary

On 11/16/2021 SHERRY LYNETTE MILLER MARTINEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CHRISTOPHER SEAN SHILEY. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sherry Lynette Miller Martinez

Defendant

Christopher Sean Shiley

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kourosh Pourmorady

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY MILLER MARTINEZ, SHERRY LYNETTE ON 11/16/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY MILLER MARTINEZ, SHERRY LYNETTE ON 11/16/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MILLER MARTINEZ, SHERRY LYNETTE ON 11/16/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MILLER MARTINEZ, SHERRY LYNETTE ON 11/16/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MILLER MARTINEZ, SHERRY LYNETTE ON 11/16/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MILLER MARTINEZ, SHERRY LYNETTE ON 11/16/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY E-FILINGSOFAMERICA FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12972663 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12800580.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY E-FILINGSOFAMERICA FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12972663 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12800580.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/21/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/21/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 11/22/2021 08:43:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 11/22/2021 08:43:00 AM.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2022
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: MCCORMICK; Department: C13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 11/22/2021 08:43:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketTHE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CURRENTLY SET ON 04/21/2022 IS ORDERED ADVANCED TO 02/10/2022 AT 09:00 AM IN C13.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/10/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/21/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY E-FILINGSOFAMERICA FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12972663 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12800580.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31087213 RECEIVED ON 11/16/2021 06:09:03 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MCCORMICK, MELISSA ON 11/16/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MILLER MARTINEZ, SHERRY LYNETTE ON 11/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MILLER MARTINEZ, SHERRY LYNETTE ON 11/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY MILLER MARTINEZ, SHERRY LYNETTE ON 11/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer POURMORADY KOUROSH M.