This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/30/2021 at 06:42:12 (UTC).

SHERRY H. PILARRELLA VS. RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/17/2021 SHERRY H PILARRELLA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sherry H. Pilarrella

Defendant

Ralphs Grocery Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paoli & Purdy, P.C.

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PILARRELLA, SHERRY H. ON 08/25/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PILARRELLA, SHERRY H. ON 08/25/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 12/06/2021 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 12/06/2021 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12901957 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12729756.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12901957 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12729756.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PILARRELLA, SHERRY H. ON 06/17/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PILARRELLA, SHERRY H. ON 06/17/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PILARRELLA, SHERRY H. ON 06/17/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PILARRELLA, SHERRY H. ON 06/17/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY PILARRELLA, SHERRY H. ON 06/17/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY PILARRELLA, SHERRY H. ON 06/17/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2021
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: MARKS; Department: C25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PILARRELLA, SHERRY H. ON 08/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1886802 RECEIVED ON 08/25/2021 04:45:13 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 12/06/2021 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12901957 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12729756.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1860414 RECEIVED ON 06/17/2021 03:18:51 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MARKS, LINDA ON 06/17/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PILARRELLA, SHERRY H. ON 06/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PILARRELLA, SHERRY H. ON 06/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY PILARRELLA, SHERRY H. ON 06/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY is a litigant