This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/07/2022 at 07:35:52 (UTC).

SHERONN HUGHES VS. JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/14/2022 SHERONN HUGHES filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA, LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sheronn Hughes

Defendant

Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bickel Sannipoli APC

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY HUGHES, SHERONN ON 01/14/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY HUGHES, SHERONN ON 01/14/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY HUGHES, SHERONN ON 01/14/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY HUGHES, SHERONN ON 01/14/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY HUGHES, SHERONN ON 01/14/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY HUGHES, SHERONN ON 01/14/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12995291 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12823210.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12995291 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12823210.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/23/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN N06 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/23/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN N06 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY HUGHES, SHERONN ON 01/26/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY HUGHES, SHERONN ON 01/26/2022

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2022
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: SALTER; Department: N06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY HUGHES, SHERONN ON 01/26/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1944146 RECEIVED ON 01/26/2022 11:39:29 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/23/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN N06 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12995291 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12823210.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21110836 RECEIVED ON 01/14/2022 05:32:02 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SALTER, GLENN ON 01/14/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY HUGHES, SHERONN ON 01/14/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY HUGHES, SHERONN ON 01/14/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY HUGHES, SHERONN ON 01/14/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC is a litigant