This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/09/2019 at 06:47:53 (UTC).

SHELTER COVE APTS. VS. OLIVO RODRIGUEZ HERNANDEZ

Case Summary

On 06/27/2017 SHELTER COVE APTS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against OLIVO RODRIGUEZ HERNANDEZ. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHELTER COVE APTS.

Defendants

MARIA HERNANDEZ DE ALFARO

OLIVO RODRIGUEZ HERNANDEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE DURINGER LAW GROUP PLC.

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY SHELTER COVE APTS. ON 02/04/2019

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY SHELTER COVE APTS. ON 02/04/2019

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY SHELTER COVE APTS. ON 06/29/2018

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY SHELTER COVE APTS. ON 06/29/2018

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT, 141 - WRIT, 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 75.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12244239 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12067974.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT, 141 - WRIT, 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 75.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12244239 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12067974.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 10/27/17) RECEIVED ON 10/26/2017.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 10/27/17) RECEIVED ON 10/26/2017.

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY SHELTER COVE APTS. ON 09/13/2017

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY SHELTER COVE APTS. ON 09/13/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12206484 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12030204.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12206484 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12030204.

WRIT RECEIVED ON 08/17/2017.

WRIT RECEIVED ON 08/17/2017.

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 08/17/2017.

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 08/17/2017.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY SHELTER COVE APTS. ON 08/09/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY SHELTER COVE APTS. ON 08/09/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY SHELTER COVE APTS. ON 08/09/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY SHELTER COVE APTS. ON 08/09/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE (ANSWER) FILED BY DE ALFARO, MARIA HERNANDEZ; HERNANDEZ, OLIVO RODRIGUEZ ON 08/09/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE (ANSWER) FILED BY DE ALFARO, MARIA HERNANDEZ; HERNANDEZ, OLIVO RODRIGUEZ ON 08/09/2017

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT 08/03/2017 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT 08/03/2017 01:30:00 PM.

OPPOSITION FILED BY SHELTER COVE APTS. ON 07/21/2017

OPPOSITION FILED BY SHELTER COVE APTS. ON 07/21/2017

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY HERNANDEZ, OLIVO RODRIGUEZ; DE ALFARO, MARIA HERNANDEZ ON 07/10/2017

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY HERNANDEZ, OLIVO RODRIGUEZ; DE ALFARO, MARIA HERNANDEZ ON 07/10/2017

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/10/2017

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/10/2017

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4745977 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4745977 REJECTED.

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SHELTER COVE APTS. ON 06/27/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SHELTER COVE APTS. ON 06/27/2017

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY SHELTER COVE APTS. ON 02/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT, 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 50.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12377826 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12201573.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (ISSUED ON 7/2/18) RECEIVED ON 06/29/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (ISSUED ON 7/2/18) RECEIVED ON 06/29/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY SHELTER COVE APTS. ON 06/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1514657 RECEIVED ON 06/29/2018 10:28:52 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY SHELTER COVE APTS. ON 06/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2685387 RECEIVED ON 06/27/2018 10:56:23 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY SHELTER COVE APTS. ON 05/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY SHELTER COVE APTS. ON 05/15/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1398770 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4745977 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12179144 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12002854.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SHELTER COVE APTS. ON 06/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SHELTER COVE APTS. ON 06/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY SHELTER COVE APTS. ON 06/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2567682 RECEIVED ON 06/27/2017 03:24:32 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less