This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/07/2019 at 08:22:37 (UTC).

SHAYNE AVINGER VS ADAM AVINGER

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 SHAYNE AVINGER filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ADAM AVINGER. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1696

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

AVINGER, SHAYNE

Respondent

AVINGER, ADAM

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2017
  • NOTICE - PAYMENT OF SUPPORT 09/18/2017 cc: from San Bernardino Co DCSS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • NOTICE - REGISTRATION OF CALIF SUPPORT ORDER 09/18/2017 cc: from San Bernardino Co DCSS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • STATEMENT - REGISTRATION OF CALIF SUPPORT ORDER 09/18/2017 cc: from San Bernardino Co DCSS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 06/22/2016; Filing Party: AVINGER, SHAYNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 06/22/2016; Filing Party: AVINGER, SHAYNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • JUDGMENT - FAMILY CODE 2336 06/22/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • WAIVER - FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 05/13/2016; Filing Party: AVINGER, SHAYNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 05/13/2016; Filing Party: AVINGER, ADAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 05/13/2016; Filing Party: AVINGER, SHAYNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT 05/13/2016; Filing Party: AVINGER, SHAYNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • REQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT 05/13/2016; Filing Party: AVINGER, SHAYNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • NOTICE & ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT 05/13/2016; Filing Party: AVINGER, SHAYNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 05/13/2016; Filing Party: AVINGER, SHAYNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 02/26/2016; Filing Party: AVINGER, SHAYNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 02/26/2016; Filing Party: AVINGER, SHAYNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • SUMMONS 02/26/2016; Filing Party: AVINGER, SHAYNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 02/26/2016 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: AVINGER, SHAYNE

    Read MoreRead Less