This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/11/2019 at 06:19:18 (UTC).

SHAWN DIANTONIO VS KRISTA DIANTONIO

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 SHAWN DIANTONIO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against KRISTA DIANTONIO. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8354

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DIANTONIO, SHAWN JOSEPH

Respondent

DIANTONIO, KRISTA LYNN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

WEINBERG, ROBERT KEITH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2018
  • NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 05/02/2018; Filing Party: DIANTONIO, SHAWN JOSEPH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 05/02/2018; Filing Party: DIANTONIO, SHAWN JOSEPH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT 03/15/2018; Filing Party: DIANTONIO, SHAWN JOSEPH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • REQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT 03/15/2018; Filing Party: DIANTONIO, SHAWN JOSEPH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • WAIVER - FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 01/11/2018; Filing Party: DIANTONIO, SHAWN JOSEPH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 01/11/2018; Filing Party: DIANTONIO, SHAWN JOSEPH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 01/11/2018; Filing Party: DIANTONIO, KRISTA LYNN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 01/11/2018; Filing Party: DIANTONIO, SHAWN JOSEPH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • NOTICE & ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT 01/11/2018; Filing Party: DIANTONIO, SHAWN JOSEPH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 01/11/2018; Filing Party: DIANTONIO, SHAWN JOSEPH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 10/20/2017; Filing Party: DIANTONIO, SHAWN JOSEPH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 10/20/2017 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: DIANTONIO, SHAWN JOSEPH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • SUMMONS 10/20/2017; Filing Party: DIANTONIO, SHAWN JOSEPH

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.