This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 06/12/2022 at 03:46:14 (UTC).

SHAWN BROOKS-TUDOR VS. FIRST TRANSIT, INC.

Case Summary

On 03/30/2022 SHAWN BROOKS-TUDOR filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against FIRST TRANSIT, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-WJC

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shawn Brooks-Tudor

Defendant

First Transit, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

The Law Office of Jonathan J. Moon

The Sweeney Law Firm

Defendant Attorney

Littler Mendelson, P.C.

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BROOKS-TUDOR, SHAWN ON 04/01/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BROOKS-TUDOR, SHAWN ON 04/01/2022

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/02/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN W08 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/02/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN W08 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13028266 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12856247.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13028266 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12856247.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BROOKS-TUDOR, SHAWN ON 03/30/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BROOKS-TUDOR, SHAWN ON 03/30/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY BROOKS-TUDOR, SHAWN ON 03/30/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY BROOKS-TUDOR, SHAWN ON 03/30/2022

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY BROOKS-TUDOR, SHAWN ON 04/11/2022

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY BROOKS-TUDOR, SHAWN ON 04/11/2022

ANSWER (GENERAL DENIAL) FILED BY FIRST TRANSIT, INC. ON 05/06/2022

ANSWER (GENERAL DENIAL) FILED BY FIRST TRANSIT, INC. ON 05/06/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13045786 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12873802.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13045786 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12873802.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2022
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: SCHWARM; Department: W08

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21156202 RECEIVED ON 05/06/2022 10:57:44 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13045786 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12873802.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER (GENERAL DENIAL) FILED BY FIRST TRANSIT, INC. ON 05/06/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31142656 RECEIVED ON 04/11/2022 01:12:53 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY BROOKS-TUDOR, SHAWN ON 04/11/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21141178 RECEIVED ON 03/31/2022 09:55:11 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BROOKS-TUDOR, SHAWN ON 04/01/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31138407 RECEIVED ON 03/30/2022 02:57:09 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY BROOKS-TUDOR, SHAWN ON 03/30/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BROOKS-TUDOR, SHAWN ON 03/30/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13028266 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12856247.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SCHWARM, WALTER ON 03/30/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/02/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN W08 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIRST TRANSIT is a litigant