This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/27/2022 at 05:11:59 (UTC).

SHASTA P. HANSEN VS. GENERAL MOTORS, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/10/2022 SHASTA P HANSEN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS, LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shasta P. Hansen

Defendant

General Motors, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MFS Legal, Inc.

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/23/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/23/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13090177 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12918167.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13090177 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12918167.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY HANSEN, SHASTA P. ON 08/10/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY HANSEN, SHASTA P. ON 08/10/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY HANSEN, SHASTA P. ON 08/10/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY HANSEN, SHASTA P. ON 08/10/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY HANSEN, SHASTA P. ON 08/10/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY HANSEN, SHASTA P. ON 08/10/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY HANSEN, SHASTA P. ON 08/19/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY HANSEN, SHASTA P. ON 08/19/2022

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2023
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: DOURBETAS; Department: C14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31196469 RECEIVED ON 08/19/2022 04:31:47 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY HANSEN, SHASTA P. ON 08/19/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21194394 RECEIVED ON 08/10/2022 09:37:06 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13090177 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12918167.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/23/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY HANSEN, SHASTA P. ON 08/10/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY HANSEN, SHASTA P. ON 08/10/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY HANSEN, SHASTA P. ON 08/10/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER DOURBETAS, NICO ON 08/10/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant