This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/22/2023 at 03:42:13 (UTC).

SHASITY RAY HERRERA VS. KAISER PERMANENTE INTERNATIONAL

Case Summary

On 11/09/2022 SHASITY RAY HERRERA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against KAISER PERMANENTE INTERNATIONAL. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Civil Complex Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CXC

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shasity Ray Herrera

Defendants

Kaiser Permanente International

Southern California Permanente Medical Group, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JAMES HAWKINS APLC

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY HERRERA, SHASITY RAY ON 11/09/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY HERRERA, SHASITY RAY ON 11/09/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY HERRERA, SHASITY RAY ON 11/09/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY HERRERA, SHASITY RAY ON 11/09/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY HERRERA, SHASITY RAY ON 11/09/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY HERRERA, SHASITY RAY ON 11/09/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13135495 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12963566.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13135495 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12963566.

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY HERRERA, SHASITY RAY ON 01/17/2023

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY HERRERA, SHASITY RAY ON 01/17/2023

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY HERRERA, SHASITY RAY ON 01/17/2023

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY HERRERA, SHASITY RAY ON 01/17/2023

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY HERRERA, SHASITY RAY ON 01/17/2023

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY HERRERA, SHASITY RAY ON 01/17/2023

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY HERRERA, SHASITY RAY ON 01/20/2023

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY HERRERA, SHASITY RAY ON 01/20/2023

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY HERRERA, SHASITY RAY ON 01/20/2023

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY HERRERA, SHASITY RAY ON 01/20/2023

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY HERRERA, SHASITY RAY ON 01/20/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11091533 RECEIVED ON 01/20/2023 04:54:21 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY HERRERA, SHASITY RAY ON 01/20/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31259271 RECEIVED ON 01/20/2023 04:54:19 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41435883 RECEIVED ON 01/17/2023 04:29:22 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY HERRERA, SHASITY RAY ON 01/17/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY HERRERA, SHASITY RAY ON 01/17/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41435561 RECEIVED ON 01/17/2023 11:28:33 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY HERRERA, SHASITY RAY ON 01/17/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11089356 RECEIVED ON 01/17/2023 11:28:33 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13135495 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12963566.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31230867 RECEIVED ON 11/09/2022 03:57:18 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HURWITZ, LON ON 11/09/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY HERRERA, SHASITY RAY ON 11/09/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY HERRERA, SHASITY RAY ON 11/09/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY HERRERA, SHASITY RAY ON 11/09/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KAISER PERMANENTE INTERNATIONAL is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAWKINS JAMES ROSS