This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/15/2022 at 04:18:58 (UTC).

SHARK TM LTD VS. MANHATTAN BEACHWEAR, INC.

Case Summary

On 03/30/2021 SHARK TM LTD filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MANHATTAN BEACHWEAR, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shark TM LTD

Defendant

Manhattan Beachwear, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Martensen Wright PC

Other Attorneys

THE MALONEY FIRM, APC

 

Court Documents

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 12/10/2021 10:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 12/10/2021 10:00:00 AM.

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY MANHATTAN BEACHWEAR, INC. ON 10/05/2021

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY MANHATTAN BEACHWEAR, INC. ON 10/05/2021

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY MANHATTAN BEACHWEAR, INC. ON 10/05/2021

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY MANHATTAN BEACHWEAR, INC. ON 10/05/2021

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 10/05/2021 10:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 10/05/2021 10:00:00 AM.

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY MANHATTAN BEACHWEAR, INC. ON 08/26/2021

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY MANHATTAN BEACHWEAR, INC. ON 08/26/2021

ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEYS MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL (AS TO MANHATTAN BEACHWEAR, INC.) FILED BY MANHATTAN BEACHWEAR, INC. ON 08/24/2021

ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEYS MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL (AS TO MANHATTAN BEACHWEAR, INC.) FILED BY MANHATTAN BEACHWEAR, INC. ON 08/24/2021

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 08/24/2021 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 08/24/2021 08:30:00 AM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12933595 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12761494.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12933595 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12761494.

ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEYS MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL RECEIVED ON 08/23/2021.

ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEYS MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL RECEIVED ON 08/23/2021.

MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FILED BY MANHATTAN BEACHWEAR, INC. ON 08/23/2021

MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FILED BY MANHATTAN BEACHWEAR, INC. ON 08/23/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12933561 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12761460.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12933561 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12761460.

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY MANHATTAN BEACHWEAR, INC. ON 08/23/2021

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY MANHATTAN BEACHWEAR, INC. ON 08/23/2021

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FILED BY MANHATTAN BEACHWEAR, INC. ON 08/23/2021

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FILED BY MANHATTAN BEACHWEAR, INC. ON 08/23/2021

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21056456 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21056456 REJECTED.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FILED BY MANHATTAN BEACHWEAR, INC. ON 08/23/2021

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FILED BY MANHATTAN BEACHWEAR, INC. ON 08/23/2021

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2023
  • HearingDescription: JURY TRIAL; Judge: MARKS; Department: C25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 12/10/2021 10:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SCHEDULED FOR 12/10/2021 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RULING FILED BY MANHATTAN BEACHWEAR, INC. ON 10/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1902408 RECEIVED ON 10/05/2021 03:01:02 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY MANHATTAN BEACHWEAR, INC. ON 10/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21073260 RECEIVED ON 10/05/2021 11:54:50 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1844198 RECEIVED ON 05/06/2021 02:03:58 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 08/17/2021 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY SHARK TM LTD ON 04/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21004818 RECEIVED ON 04/09/2021 10:31:05 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MARKS, LINDA ON 03/30/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12865645 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12693324.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SHARK TM LTD ON 03/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SHARK TM LTD ON 03/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY SHARK TM LTD ON 03/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3997160 RECEIVED ON 03/30/2021 08:39:38 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Manhattan Beachwear, Inc. is a litigant