This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 12/06/2021 at 03:04:16 (UTC).

SHARED MEDICAL SERVICES, INC. VS. EAST OHIO REGIONAL HOSPITAL

Case Summary

On 07/24/2020 SHARED MEDICAL SERVICES, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against EAST OHIO REGIONAL HOSPITAL. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shared Medical Services, Inc.

Defendants

East Ohio Regional Hospital

Alecto Healthcare Services LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alan L. Brodkin & Associates

Defendant Attorney

Law Offices of Michael J. Sarrao

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY SHARED MEDICAL SERVICES, INC. ON 07/24/2020

COMPLAINT FILED BY SHARED MEDICAL SERVICES, INC. ON 07/24/2020

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SHARED MEDICAL SERVICES, INC. ON 07/24/2020

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SHARED MEDICAL SERVICES, INC. ON 07/24/2020

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SHARED MEDICAL SERVICES, INC. ON 07/24/2020

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SHARED MEDICAL SERVICES, INC. ON 07/24/2020

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12762466 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12588903.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12762466 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12588903.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER CRANDALL, JAMES ON 07/24/2020.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER CRANDALL, JAMES ON 07/24/2020.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY ALECTO HEALTHCARE SERVICES LLC ON 08/31/2020

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY ALECTO HEALTHCARE SERVICES LLC ON 08/31/2020

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12776495 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12603177.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12776495 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12603177.

MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/10/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C33 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/10/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C33 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 07/11/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C33 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 07/11/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C33 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY SHARED MEDICAL SERVICES, INC. ON 01/07/2021

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY SHARED MEDICAL SERVICES, INC. ON 01/07/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3969125 RECEIVED ON 01/07/2021 12:01:47 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY SHARED MEDICAL SERVICES, INC. ON 01/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 07/11/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C33 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/10/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C33 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12776495 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12603177.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3932371 RECEIVED ON 08/31/2020 07:37:25 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY ALECTO HEALTHCARE SERVICES LLC ON 08/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12762466 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12588903.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1754384 RECEIVED ON 07/24/2020 02:26:34 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER CRANDALL, JAMES ON 07/24/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SHARED MEDICAL SERVICES, INC. ON 07/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SHARED MEDICAL SERVICES, INC. ON 07/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY SHARED MEDICAL SERVICES, INC. ON 07/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALECTO HEALTHCARE SERVICES, LLC is a litigant