This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:48:34 (UTC).

SHAOFA JIN VS. RICO ZARINDAST

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 SHAOFA JIN filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against RICO ZARINDAST. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHAOFA JIN

Defendants

RICO ZARINDAST

JOANN FERGUSEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DENNIS P. BLOCK & ASSOCIATES

Defendant Attorney

STERLING SCOTT WINCHELL

 

Court Documents

OPPOSITION FILED BY JIN, SHAOFA ON 09/20/2016

OPPOSITION FILED BY JIN, SHAOFA ON 09/20/2016

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY) FILED BY ZARINDAST, RICO ON 06/23/2016

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY) FILED BY ZARINDAST, RICO ON 06/23/2016

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ZARINDAST, RICO ON 06/27/2016

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ZARINDAST, RICO ON 06/27/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY JIN, SHAOFA ON 04/18/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY JIN, SHAOFA ON 04/18/2016

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY ZARINDAST, RICO ON 11/30/2016

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY ZARINDAST, RICO ON 11/30/2016

AMENDED JUDGMENT (FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 09/30/2016

AMENDED JUDGMENT (FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 09/30/2016

MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND FILED BY ZARINDAST, RICO ON 10/14/2016

MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND FILED BY ZARINDAST, RICO ON 10/14/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY JIN, SHAOFA ON 04/18/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY JIN, SHAOFA ON 04/18/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY JIN, SHAOFA ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY JIN, SHAOFA ON 02/26/2016

OPPOSITION FILED BY JIN, SHAOFA ON 09/09/2016

OPPOSITION FILED BY JIN, SHAOFA ON 09/09/2016

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND 12/16/2016 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND 12/16/2016 09:00:00 AM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12046830 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11870775.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12046830 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11870775.

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY ZARINDAST, RICO ON 09/26/2016

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY ZARINDAST, RICO ON 09/26/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 04/21/2016 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 04/21/2016 08:30:00 AM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927682 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751907.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927682 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751907.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY ZARINDAST, RICO ON 03/30/2016

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY ZARINDAST, RICO ON 03/30/2016

STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/20/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/20/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2016
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT FINDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT FINDING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • THE COURT ENTERS JUDGMENT AS TO COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • THE COURT ENTERS JUDGMENT AS TO COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND 12/16/2016 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY ZARINDAST, RICO ON 11/30/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4642123 RECEIVED ON 11/30/2016 11:30:35 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY ZARINDAST, RICO ON 11/17/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1355043 RECEIVED ON 11/17/2016 04:00:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND SCHEDULED FOR 12/16/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C14 AT .

    Read MoreRead Less
58 More Docket Entries
  • 03/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/20/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11932510 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11756695.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER RECEIVED ON 03/07/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3388491 RECEIVED ON 03/07/2016 03:20:54 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER UNASSIGNED ON 02/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927682 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751907.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY JIN, SHAOFA ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY JIN, SHAOFA ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY JIN, SHAOFA ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4509629 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 12:53:57 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.