This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/18/2022 at 22:51:15 (UTC).

SHADI BANIANI VS SAM MALEK

Case Summary

On 05/12/2017 SHADI BANIANI filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SAM MALEK. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PALAFOX, JULIE A.. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3993

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

Judge Details

Judge

PALAFOX, JULIE A.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BANIANI, SHADI S

Claimants

TIAA CONTRIBUTION PLAN

QUANDRY PEAK RESEARCH RETIREMENT TRUST

UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA RETIREMENT SAVINGS PROGRAM

THRIFT SAVINGS PLAN

Respondent

MALEK, SAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MASSON & FATINI, LLP

Respondent Attorney

BAYATI LAW GROUP PC

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 06/13/2019

JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 06/13/2019

PETITION - DISSOLUTION 05/12/2017 Amount:$435.00

PETITION - DISSOLUTION 05/12/2017 Amount:$435.00

SUMMONS 05/12/2017

SUMMONS 05/12/2017

NOTICE - RELATED CASE 05/12/2017

NOTICE - RELATED CASE 05/12/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 05/24/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 05/24/2017

RESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 06/08/2017 Amount:$435.00

RESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 06/08/2017 Amount:$435.00

NOTICE - RELATED CASE 06/08/2017

NOTICE - RELATED CASE 06/08/2017

PROPERTY DECLARATION - SEPARATE 06/08/2017

PROPERTY DECLARATION - SEPARATE 06/08/2017

DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 07/18/2017 Preliminary

DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 07/18/2017 Preliminary

INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 11/14/2017

INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 11/14/2017

RFO - OTHER 11/14/2017 spousal support, property control, attorney's fees, forensic accounting

RFO - OTHER 11/14/2017 spousal support, property control, attorney's fees, forensic accounting

PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 11/21/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 11/21/2017

INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 03/02/2018 Petitioner's Income and Expense Declaration

INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 03/02/2018 Petitioner's Income and Expense Declaration

MINUTE ORDER 03/05/2018

MINUTE ORDER 03/05/2018

MINUTE ORDER 05/07/2018

MINUTE ORDER 05/07/2018

STIPULATION & ORDER 05/07/2018

STIPULATION & ORDER 05/07/2018

INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 08/14/2018

INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 08/14/2018

RESPONSIVE DECLARATION - REQUEST FOR ORDER 08/14/2018

RESPONSIVE DECLARATION - REQUEST FOR ORDER 08/14/2018

129 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - RETURN EXHIBITS 07/08/2021; Filing Party: MALEK, SAM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - RETURN EXHIBITS 07/02/2021; Filing Party: BANIANI, SHADI S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • HearingDescription: TRIAL - LONG CAUSE; Department: L73

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • HearingDescription: HEARING - RFO - OTHER; Department: L73

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • HearingDescription: HEARING - RFO - MODIFICATION; Department: L73

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketHEARING - RFO - MODIFICATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketHEARING - RFO - OTHER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketJUDGMENT - FAMILY CODE 2336 06/24/2021 Judge:PALAFOX, JULIE A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketTRIAL - LONG CAUSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSO OR LEGAL SEP 06/24/2021; Filing Party: MALEK, SAM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
225 More Docket Entries
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 11/14/2017; Filing Party: BANIANI, SHADI S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRFO - OTHER 11/14/2017 spousal support, property control, attorney's fees, forensic accounting; Filing Party: BANIANI, SHADI S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 07/18/2017 Preliminary; Filing Party: BANIANI, SHADI S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 06/08/2017 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: MALEK, SAM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - RELATED CASE 06/08/2017; Filing Party: MALEK, SAM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPERTY DECLARATION - SEPARATE 06/08/2017; Filing Party: MALEK, SAM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 05/24/2017; Filing Party: BANIANI, SHADI S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION - DISSOLUTION 05/12/2017 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: BANIANI, SHADI S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS 05/12/2017; Filing Party: BANIANI, SHADI S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - RELATED CASE 05/12/2017; Filing Party: BANIANI, SHADI S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less