This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/25/2021 at 08:05:29 (UTC).

SERGIO CRUZ VS. FORD MOTOR COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/01/2021 SERGIO CRUZ filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FORD MOTOR COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sergio Cruz

Defendant

Ford Motor Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Romano Stancroff PC

Defendant Attorney

Erskine Law Group, PC

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY CRUZ, SERGIO ON 09/16/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY CRUZ, SERGIO ON 09/16/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12943011 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12770906.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12943011 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12770906.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY FORD MOTOR COMPANY ON 09/10/2021

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY FORD MOTOR COMPANY ON 09/10/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/04/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C21 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/04/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C21 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12937997 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12765896.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12937997 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12765896.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CRUZ, SERGIO ON 09/01/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CRUZ, SERGIO ON 09/01/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CRUZ, SERGIO ON 09/01/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CRUZ, SERGIO ON 09/01/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY CRUZ, SERGIO ON 09/01/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY CRUZ, SERGIO ON 09/01/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2022
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: SERVINO; Department: C21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY CRUZ, SERGIO ON 09/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21065824 RECEIVED ON 09/16/2021 10:31:09 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12943011 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12770906.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41238728 RECEIVED ON 09/10/2021 08:29:22 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY FORD MOTOR COMPANY ON 09/10/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/04/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C21 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12937997 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12765896.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1889076 RECEIVED ON 09/01/2021 08:30:41 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SERVINO, DEBORAH ON 09/01/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CRUZ, SERGIO ON 09/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CRUZ, SERGIO ON 09/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY CRUZ, SERGIO ON 09/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ford Motor Company is a litigant