This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/16/2018 at 04:24:02 (UTC).

SEQUOIA EQUITIES - ALICANTE, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP VS. MONIQUE LONG

Case Summary

On 04/29/2016 SEQUOIA EQUITIES - ALICANTE, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MONIQUE LONG. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-HNB

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SEQUOIA EQUITIES - ALICANTE, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Defendant

MONIQUE LONG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN LLP

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY SEQUOIA EQUITIES - ALICANTE, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 04/29/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY SEQUOIA EQUITIES - ALICANTE, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 04/29/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SEQUOIA EQUITIES - ALICANTE, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 04/29/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SEQUOIA EQUITIES - ALICANTE, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 04/29/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SEQUOIA EQUITIES - ALICANTE, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 04/29/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SEQUOIA EQUITIES - ALICANTE, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 04/29/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11960289 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11784434.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11960289 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11784434.

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER RECEIVED ON 05/05/2016.

APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER RECEIVED ON 05/05/2016.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11963

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11963073 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11787212.

APPLICATION - OTHER (AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING) FILED BY SEQUOIA EQUITIES - ALICANTE, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 05/06/2016

APPLICATION - OTHER (AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING) FILED BY SEQUOIA EQUITIES - ALICANTE, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 05/06/2016

REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY SEQUOIA EQUITIES - ALICANTE, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 05/24/2016

REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY SEQUOIA EQUITIES - ALICANTE, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 05/24/2016

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED & ENTERED 05/25/2016) RECEIVED ON 05/24/2016.

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED & ENTERED 05/25/2016) RECEIVED ON 05/24/2016.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY SEQUOIA EQUITIES - ALICANTE, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 05/24/2016

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY SEQUOIA EQUITIES - ALICANTE, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 05/24/2016

WRIT (ISSUED ON 05/25/2016) RECEIVED ON 05/24/2016.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 05/25/2016) RECEIVED ON 05/24/2016.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY SEQUOIA EQUITIES - ALICANTE, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 05/24/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY SEQUOIA EQUITIES - ALICANTE, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 05/24/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11973125 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11797285.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11973125 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11797285.

WRIT OF POSSESSION - UNSATISFIED FILED BY SEQUOIA EQUITIES - ALICANTE, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 09/28/2017

WRIT OF POSSESSION - UNSATISFIED FILED BY SEQUOIA EQUITIES - ALICANTE, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 09/28/2017

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION - UNSATISFIED FILED BY SEQUOIA EQUITIES - ALICANTE, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 09/28/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2016
  • DocketCASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11973125 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11797285.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY SEQUOIA EQUITIES - ALICANTE, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 05/24/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT (ISSUED ON 05/25/2016) RECEIVED ON 05/24/2016.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY SEQUOIA EQUITIES - ALICANTE, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 05/24/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED & ENTERED 05/25/2016) RECEIVED ON 05/24/2016.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY SEQUOIA EQUITIES - ALICANTE, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 05/24/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2016
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3417262 RECEIVED ON 05/24/2016 12:33:43 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION - OTHER (AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING) FILED BY SEQUOIA EQUITIES - ALICANTE, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 05/06/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11963073 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11787212.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER RECEIVED ON 05/05/2016.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2016
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4543167 RECEIVED ON 05/05/2016 01:34:23 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11960289 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11784434.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SEQUOIA EQUITIES - ALICANTE, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 04/29/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SEQUOIA EQUITIES - ALICANTE, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 04/29/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY SEQUOIA EQUITIES - ALICANTE, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 04/29/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2016
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3408716 RECEIVED ON 04/29/2016 02:09:42 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less