This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/14/2022 at 05:03:21 (UTC).

SECOND TL HOLDINGS, LLC VS. A&H SPORTSWEAR CO., INC.

Case Summary

On 03/09/2021 SECOND TL HOLDINGS, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against A H SPORTSWEAR CO , INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff

Second TL Holdings, LLC

Cross Defendants and Defendants

Manhattan Beachwear, Inc.

East Brook Holdings, LLC

A&H Sportswear Co., Inc.

Second TL Holdings, LLC

Ralph Lauren Corporation

MANHATTAN BEACHWEAR, INC

Others and Defendants

A&H Sportswear Co., Inc.

Ralph Lauren Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorney

Shulman Bastian Friedman & Bui LLP

Other, Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Cozen O'Connor

Shulman Bastian Friedman & Bui LLP

Other Attorneys

THE MALONEY FIRM, APC

 

Court Documents

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION - OTHER 01/10/2022 10:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION - OTHER 01/10/2022 10:00:00 AM.

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY RALPH LAUREN CORPORATION ON 01/10/2022

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY RALPH LAUREN CORPORATION ON 01/10/2022

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY A&H SPORTSWEAR CO., INC. ON 01/05/2022

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY A&H SPORTSWEAR CO., INC. ON 01/05/2022

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY RALPH LAUREN CORPORATION ON 01/05/2022

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY RALPH LAUREN CORPORATION ON 01/05/2022

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY A&H SPORTSWEAR CO., INC.; RALPH LAUREN CORPORATION ON 12/29/2021

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY A&H SPORTSWEAR CO., INC.; RALPH LAUREN CORPORATION ON 12/29/2021

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY SECOND TL HOLDINGS, LLC ON 12/20/2021

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY SECOND TL HOLDINGS, LLC ON 12/20/2021

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 12/10/2021 10:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 12/10/2021 10:00:00 AM.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED BY A&H SPORTSWEAR CO., INC. ON 12/02/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED BY A&H SPORTSWEAR CO., INC. ON 12/02/2021

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION - OTHER 11/22/2021 10:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION - OTHER 11/22/2021 10:00:00 AM.

OBJECTION FILED BY SECOND TL HOLDINGS, LLC ON 11/19/2021

OBJECTION FILED BY SECOND TL HOLDINGS, LLC ON 11/19/2021

REPLY - OTHER FILED BY RALPH LAUREN CORPORATION ON 11/15/2021

REPLY - OTHER FILED BY RALPH LAUREN CORPORATION ON 11/15/2021

REPLY - OTHER FILED BY RALPH LAUREN CORPORATION ON 11/15/2021

REPLY - OTHER FILED BY RALPH LAUREN CORPORATION ON 11/15/2021

PROPOSED ORDER (NOT SIGNED) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 05/04/2021

PROPOSED ORDER (NOT SIGNED) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 05/04/2021

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY MANHATTAN BEACHWEAR, INC. ON 10/05/2021

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY MANHATTAN BEACHWEAR, INC. ON 10/05/2021

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

77 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2023
  • HearingDescription: JURY TRIAL; Judge: MARKS; Department: C25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION - OTHER 01/10/2022 10:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RULING FILED BY RALPH LAUREN CORPORATION ON 01/10/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41283750 RECEIVED ON 01/10/2022 12:29:22 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1935953 RECEIVED ON 01/05/2022 03:24:43 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY A&H SPORTSWEAR CO., INC. ON 01/05/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY RALPH LAUREN CORPORATION ON 01/05/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RULING FILED BY A&H SPORTSWEAR CO., INC.; RALPH LAUREN CORPORATION ON 12/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31102093 RECEIVED ON 12/29/2021 12:52:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER FILED BY SECOND TL HOLDINGS, LLC ON 12/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
140 More Docket Entries
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY A&H SPORTSWEAR CO., INC. ON 04/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/19/2021 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE - CERTIFIED MAIL - OUT OF STATE FILED BY SECOND TL HOLDINGS, LLC ON 03/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2997160 RECEIVED ON 03/22/2021 03:15:31 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12855608 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12683287.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41166734 RECEIVED ON 03/09/2021 04:20:51 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MARKS, LINDA ON 03/09/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SECOND TL HOLDINGS, LLC ON 03/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SECOND TL HOLDINGS, LLC ON 03/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY SECOND TL HOLDINGS, LLC ON 03/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RALPH LAUREN CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Manhattan Beachwear, Inc. is a litigant