This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/21/2023 at 07:20:01 (UTC).

SC&P RESOURCES, INC. VS. IGT LIGHTING, INC.

Case Summary

On 01/17/2017 SC P RESOURCES, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against IGT LIGHTING, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-WJC

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SC&P RESOURCES, INC.

Defendants

IGT LIGHTING, INC.

ANDREW PARK

IGT LED LIGHTING, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

C&R LEGAL GROUP LLP

Other Attorneys

BAE PARK & NAZDJANOVA A PROFESSIONAL C

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF RELOCATION

NOTICE OF RELOCATION

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY SC&P RESOURCES, INC. ON 12/21/2020

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY SC&P RESOURCES, INC. ON 12/21/2020

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES 12/10/2020 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES 12/10/2020 01:30:00 PM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12784346 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12611145.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12784346 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12611145.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY SC&P RESOURCES, INC. ON 09/11/2020

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY SC&P RESOURCES, INC. ON 09/11/2020

MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY SC&P RESOURCES, INC. ON 09/11/2020

MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY SC&P RESOURCES, INC. ON 09/11/2020

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2915858 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2915858 REJECTED.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES 08/27/2020 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES 08/27/2020 01:30:00 PM.

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY SC&P RESOURCES, INC. ON 08/31/2020

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY SC&P RESOURCES, INC. ON 08/31/2020

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/25/2020 02:42:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/25/2020 02:42:00 PM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12752455 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12578828.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12752455 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12578828.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY SC&P RESOURCES, INC. ON 06/09/2020

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY SC&P RESOURCES, INC. ON 06/09/2020

MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY SC&P RESOURCES, INC. ON 06/09/2020

MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY SC&P RESOURCES, INC. ON 06/09/2020

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/09/2020

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/09/2020

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (WORKSHEET) FILED BY SC&P RESOURCES, INC. ON 03/11/2020

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (WORKSHEET) FILED BY SC&P RESOURCES, INC. ON 03/11/2020

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY) FILED BY SC&P RESOURCES, INC. ON 03/11/2020

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY) FILED BY SC&P RESOURCES, INC. ON 03/11/2020

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY SC&P RESOURCES, INC. ON 02/28/2020

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY SC&P RESOURCES, INC. ON 02/28/2020

181 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELOCATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RULING FILED BY SC&P RESOURCES, INC. ON 12/21/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2968128 RECEIVED ON 12/20/2020 02:49:47 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES 12/10/2020 01:30:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES SCHEDULED FOR 12/10/2020 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C31 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12784346 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12611145.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41113812 RECEIVED ON 09/11/2020 02:13:40 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY SC&P RESOURCES, INC. ON 09/11/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY SC&P RESOURCES, INC. ON 09/11/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2915858 REJECTED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
300 More Docket Entries
  • 03/03/2017
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3517766 RECEIVED ON 03/03/2017 02:07:19 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/08/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C34 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY SC&P RESOURCES, INC. ON 02/07/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY SC&P RESOURCES, INC. ON 02/07/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2529149 RECEIVED ON 02/07/2017 05:25:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12092124 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11916096.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1364050 RECEIVED ON 01/17/2017 09:53:26 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GOODING, MARTHA ON 01/17/2017.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SC&P RESOURCES, INC. ON 01/17/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY SC&P RESOURCES, INC. ON 01/17/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less