This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/23/2017 at 05:20:42 (UTC).

SCOTT MIDDLETON VS. ST. JUDE MEDICAL CENTER

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 SCOTT MIDDLETON filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against ST JUDE MEDICAL CENTER. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PAMALA A. MIDDLETON

SCOTT MIDDLETON

Defendants

ST. JUDE MEDICAL CENTER

BRADLEY D. REBER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF STEVEN D. HILLYARD, APC

Defendant Attorneys

BROBECK, WEST, BORGES, ROSA & DOUVILLE LLP

CARROLL, KELLY, TROTTER, FRANZEN, MCKENNA & PEABODY

 

Court Documents

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR ADJUDICATION 02/04/2015 02:00:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR ADJUDICATION 02/04/2015 02:00:00 PM.

DOCUMENT - OTHER (EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT) FILED BY REBER, BRADLEY D. ON 09/10/2014

DOCUMENT - OTHER (EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT) FILED BY REBER, BRADLEY D. ON 09/10/2014

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/11/2015

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/11/2015

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/18/2014

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/18/2014

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/04/2015

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/04/2015

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MIDDLETON, SCOTT; MIDDLETON, PAMALA A. ON 02/25/2014

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MIDDLETON, SCOTT; MIDDLETON, PAMALA A. ON 02/25/2014

SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY MIDDLETON, SCOTT; MIDDLETON, PAMALA A. ON 01/21/2015

SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY MIDDLETON, SCOTT; MIDDLETON, PAMALA A. ON 01/21/2015

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11713694 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11537939.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11713694 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11537939.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE 04/17/2015 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE 04/17/2015 09:00:00 AM.

SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY REBER, BRADLEY D. ON 09/10/2014

SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY REBER, BRADLEY D. ON 09/10/2014

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/04/2015

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/04/2015

ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY MIDDLETON, SCOTT; MIDDLETON, PAMALA A. ON 06/26/2014

ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY MIDDLETON, SCOTT; MIDDLETON, PAMALA A. ON 06/26/2014

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 03/19/2015 03:56:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 03/19/2015 03:56:00 PM.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY MIDDLETON, SCOTT; MIDDLETON, PAMALA A. ON 09/02/2015

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY MIDDLETON, SCOTT; MIDDLETON, PAMALA A. ON 09/02/2015

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDDLETON, SCOTT; MIDDLETON, PAMALA A. ON 01/21/2015

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDDLETON, SCOTT; MIDDLETON, PAMALA A. ON 01/21/2015

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY ST. JUDE MEDICAL CENTER ON 01/22/2014

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY ST. JUDE MEDICAL CENTER ON 01/22/2014

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR ADJUDICATION 03/18/2015 02:00:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR ADJUDICATION 03/18/2015 02:00:00 PM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11490326 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11314238.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11490326 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11314238.

63 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY MIDDLETON, PAMALA A.; MIDDLETON, SCOTT ON 09/10/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1278698 RECEIVED ON 09/10/2015 09:47:27 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ST. JUDE MEDICAL CENTER ON 09/03/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3327374 RECEIVED ON 09/03/2015 09:15:17 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY MIDDLETON, SCOTT; MIDDLETON, PAMALA A. ON 09/02/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3327175 RECEIVED ON 09/02/2015 03:25:52 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11787752 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11612075.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER (TO CONTINUE TRIAL) FILED BY MIDDLETON, SCOTT; MIDDLETON, PAMALA A. ON 05/11/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
112 More Docket Entries
  • 11/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11490326 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11314238.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY ST. JUDE MEDICAL CENTER ON 10/31/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1122231 RECEIVED ON 10/31/2013 01:40:31 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/05/2014 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C17 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GRIFFIN, CRAIG ON 08/12/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11430995 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11254867.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDDLETON, SCOTT; MIDDLETON, PAMALA A. ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDDLETON, SCOTT; MIDDLETON, PAMALA A. ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY MIDDLETON, SCOTT; MIDDLETON, PAMALA A. ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 462408 RECEIVED ON 08/12/2013 12:41:29 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less