This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/23/2017 at 05:18:03 (UTC).

SCOTT LIPPMAN VS. QUYET LE THANG

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 SCOTT LIPPMAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against QUYET LE THANG. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SCOTT LIPPMAN

Defendants

VIDEO VOICE DATA COMMUNICATIONS

QUYET LE THANG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TORKZADEH LAW FIRM

Defendant Attorneys

JOHN GARDNER HAYES

LAW OFFICE OF MARK S. JULIUS

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY LIPPMAN, SCOTT ON 08/12/2013

COMPLAINT FILED BY LIPPMAN, SCOTT ON 08/12/2013

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OC GENERATED

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OC GENERATED

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY THANG, QUYET LE; VIDEO VOICE DATA COMMUNICATIONS ON 06/16/2014

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY THANG, QUYET LE; VIDEO VOICE DATA COMMUNICATIONS ON 06/16/2014

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11470657 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11294569.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11470657 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11294569.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 06/13/2014 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 06/13/2014 01:30:00 PM.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LIPPMAN, SCOTT ON 08/12/2013

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LIPPMAN, SCOTT ON 08/12/2013

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/08/2014 09:52:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/08/2014 09:52:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE 01/10/2014 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE 01/10/2014 09:00:00 AM.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY THANG, QUYET LE; VIDEO VOICE DATA COMMUNICATIONS ON 09/18/2013

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY THANG, QUYET LE; VIDEO VOICE DATA COMMUNICATIONS ON 09/18/2013

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11431513 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11255385.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11431513 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11255385.

ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY THANG, QUYET LE ON 11/06/2013

ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY THANG, QUYET LE ON 11/06/2013

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LIPPMAN, SCOTT ON 08/12/2013

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LIPPMAN, SCOTT ON 08/12/2013

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 06/16/2014 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 06/16/2014 01:30:00 PM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11462111 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11286003.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11462111 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11286003.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2359154 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2359154 REJECTED.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (OF ENTIRE CASE) FILED BY LIPPMAN, SCOTT ON 07/18/2014

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (OF ENTIRE CASE) FILED BY LIPPMAN, SCOTT ON 07/18/2014

TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/10/2014 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C24 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/10/2014 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C24 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY THANG, QUYET LE; VIDEO VOICE DATA COMMUNICATIONS ON 06/12/2014

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY THANG, QUYET LE; VIDEO VOICE DATA COMMUNICATIONS ON 06/12/2014

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2359154 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY LIPPMAN, SCOTT ON 07/28/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2014
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3172364 RECEIVED ON 07/28/2014 12:32:42 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2014
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2014
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (OF ENTIRE CASE) FILED BY LIPPMAN, SCOTT ON 07/18/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2014
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4219235 RECEIVED ON 07/18/2014 10:54:11 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2014
  • JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 08/04/2014 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C24 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/08/2014 09:52:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 10/01/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 365756 RECEIVED ON 09/30/2013 04:45:34 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11462111 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11286003.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY THANG, QUYET LE; VIDEO VOICE DATA COMMUNICATIONS ON 09/18/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 361536 RECEIVED ON 09/18/2013 01:43:15 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HUNT, DEREK ON 08/12/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11431513 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11255385.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LIPPMAN, SCOTT ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LIPPMAN, SCOTT ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY LIPPMAN, SCOTT ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 348518 RECEIVED ON 08/12/2013 07:47:55 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less