This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:46:13 (UTC).

SCA GENERAL CONTRACTING, INC. VS. PRH I, LP

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 SCA GENERAL CONTRACTING, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PRH I, LP. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

SCA GENERAL CONTRACTING, INC.

SUNDEEP PANDHOH

Defendants and Others

PRH II, LP

MARC BARMAZEL

PRH I, LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF JAN RAINBIRD

Defendant and Other Attorney

ALPERSTEIN, SIMON, FARKAS, GILLIN & SCOTT, LLP

 

Court Documents

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY SCA GENERAL CONTRACTING, INC.; PANDHOH, SUNDEEP ON 05/16/2016

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY SCA GENERAL CONTRACTING, INC.; PANDHOH, SUNDEEP ON 05/16/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/13/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C34 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/13/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C34 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/10/2017 03:22:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/10/2017 03:22:00 PM.

RESPONSE (AND OPPOSITION) FILED BY BARMAZEL, MARC; BARMAZEL, MARC; PRH I, LP; PRH I, LP; PRH II, LP; PRH I, LP; PRH I, LP ON 11/18/2016

RESPONSE (AND OPPOSITION) FILED BY BARMAZEL, MARC; BARMAZEL, MARC; PRH I, LP; PRH I, LP; PRH II, LP; PRH I, LP; PRH I, LP ON 11/18/2016

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY BARMAZEL, MARC; PRH I, LP; PRH II, LP ON 06/20/2016

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY BARMAZEL, MARC; PRH I, LP; PRH II, LP ON 06/20/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY SCA GENERAL CONTRACTING, INC. ON 04/04/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY SCA GENERAL CONTRACTING, INC. ON 04/04/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 06/13/2016 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 06/13/2016 01:30:00 PM.

OPPOSITION FILED BY SCA GENERAL CONTRACTING, INC.; PANDHOH, SUNDEEP ON 05/24/2016

OPPOSITION FILED BY SCA GENERAL CONTRACTING, INC.; PANDHOH, SUNDEEP ON 05/24/2016

REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY BARMAZEL, MARC; PRH I, LP; PRH II, LP; PRH I, LP ON 06/17/2016

REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY BARMAZEL, MARC; PRH I, LP; PRH II, LP; PRH I, LP ON 06/17/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY SCA GENERAL CONTRACTING, INC. ON 04/01/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY SCA GENERAL CONTRACTING, INC. ON 04/01/2016

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY BARMAZEL, MARC; PRH I, LP; PRH II, LP; PRH I, LP ON 07/19/2016

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY BARMAZEL, MARC; PRH I, LP; PRH II, LP; PRH I, LP ON 07/19/2016

NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT FILED BY SCA GENERAL CONTRACTING, INC. ON 04/07/2016

NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT FILED BY SCA GENERAL CONTRACTING, INC. ON 04/07/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SCA GENERAL CONTRACTING, INC. ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SCA GENERAL CONTRACTING, INC. ON 02/26/2016

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY SCA GENERAL CONTRACTING, INC. ON 06/15/2016

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY SCA GENERAL CONTRACTING, INC. ON 06/15/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY E-FILINGSOFAMERICA FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11961640 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11785779.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY E-FILINGSOFAMERICA FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11961640 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11785779.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY BARMAZEL, MARC; PRH I, LP; PRH II, LP; PRH I, LP ON 05/18/2016

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY BARMAZEL, MARC; PRH I, LP; PRH II, LP; PRH I, LP ON 05/18/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY SCA GENERAL CONTRACTING, INC. ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY SCA GENERAL CONTRACTING, INC. ON 02/26/2016

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2461402 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2461402 REJECTED.

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2017
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY PRH I, LP; PRH I, LP; PRH I, LP; PRH I, LP; SCA GENERAL CONTRACTING, INC.; SCA GENERAL CONTRACTING, INC.; SCA GENERAL CONTRACTING, INC.; SCA GENERAL CONTRACTING, INC. ON 01/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2521653 RECEIVED ON 01/10/2017 12:08:11 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4658662 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/10/2017 03:22:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE IS SCHEDULED FOR 02/27/2017 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT C34.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE SCHEDULED FOR 02/27/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C34 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
82 More Docket Entries
  • 04/01/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1314111 RECEIVED ON 03/31/2016 01:20:06 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/22/2016 AT 09:30:00 AM IN C17 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SCA GENERAL CONTRACTING, INC. ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3385286 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 01:50:23 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GRIFFIN, CRAIG ON 02/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927179 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751404.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY SCA GENERAL CONTRACTING, INC. ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SCA GENERAL CONTRACTING, INC. ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY SCA GENERAL CONTRACTING, INC. ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1306890 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 09:21:03 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less