Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/14/2020 at 10:14:38 (UTC).

SAYEH NODOUST VS JESUS HERNANDEZ

Case Summary

On 07/02/2020 SAYEH NODOUST filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against JESUS HERNANDEZ. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WATSON, WILLIAM. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1169

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

Judge Details

Judge

WATSON, WILLIAM

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

HERNANDEZ, JESUS ESTEBAN

NODOUST, SAYEH H

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketDV RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING - AMENDED 09/04/2020 1st amended; Filing Party: NODOUST, SAYEH H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE - SERVICE BY MAIL 09/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • HearingDescription: HEARING - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE; Department: L63

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketDV RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING 09/03/2020; Filing Party: NODOUST, SAYEH H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER 09/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketHEARING - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketASSIGNMENT - COMMISSIONER OR TEMPORARY JUDGE - ALL PURPOSES 09/03/2020; Filing Party: NODOUST, SAYEH H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE 07/30/2020; Filing Party: NODOUST, SAYEH H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • HearingDescription: HEARING - EX PARTE - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE; Department: L63

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketNOTICE - RELATED CASE - NO PARTY UPDATE 07/02/2020; Filing Party: NODOUST, SAYEH H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketDV REQUEST - RESTRAINING ORDER 07/02/2020; Filing Party: NODOUST, SAYEH H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketDV TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER 07/02/2020; Filing Party: NODOUST, SAYEH H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketDV NOTICE - COURT HEARING DOMESTIC VIOLENCE 07/02/2020; Filing Party: NODOUST, SAYEH H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketHEARING - EX PARTE - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketEX PARTE REQUEST - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE 07/02/2020; Filing Party: NODOUST, SAYEH H

    Read MoreRead Less