This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 07/02/2022 at 03:46:14 (UTC).

SAUL GALVAN VS. INSTAFI.COM

Case Summary

On 04/19/2022 SAUL GALVAN filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against INSTAFI COM. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Saul Galvan

Defendants

David Galvan

Eagle Community Credit Union

Instafi.com

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Chandler Law Firm

Defendant Attorney

Wade Law Group-Southern California

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13036760 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12864781.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13036760 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12864781.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GALVAN, SAUL ON 04/19/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GALVAN, SAUL ON 04/19/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GALVAN, SAUL ON 04/19/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GALVAN, SAUL ON 04/19/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY GALVAN, SAUL ON 04/19/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY GALVAN, SAUL ON 04/19/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY GALVAN, SAUL ON 05/03/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY GALVAN, SAUL ON 05/03/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY GALVAN, SAUL ON 05/03/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY GALVAN, SAUL ON 05/03/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY GALVAN, DAVID ON 07/01/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY GALVAN, DAVID ON 07/01/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY GALVAN, DAVID ON 06/27/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY GALVAN, DAVID ON 06/27/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13069858 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12897854.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13069858 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12897854.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY GALVAN, DAVID ON 06/27/2022

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY GALVAN, DAVID ON 06/27/2022

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (4TH CAUSES PF ACTION ONLY) FILED BY GALVAN, SAUL ON 06/21/2022

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (4TH CAUSES PF ACTION ONLY) FILED BY GALVAN, SAUL ON 06/21/2022

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2022
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: GASTELUM; Department: C11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31176152 RECEIVED ON 07/01/2022 01:34:15 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY GALVAN, DAVID ON 07/01/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11005810 RECEIVED ON 06/27/2022 03:52:34 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11005812 RECEIVED ON 06/27/2022 03:55:32 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13069858 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12897854.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY GALVAN, DAVID ON 06/27/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY GALVAN, DAVID ON 06/27/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41349301 RECEIVED ON 06/21/2022 10:51:44 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (4TH CAUSES PF ACTION ONLY) FILED BY GALVAN, SAUL ON 06/21/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY GALVAN, SAUL ON 05/03/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1983605 RECEIVED ON 05/03/2022 08:39:51 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY GALVAN, SAUL ON 05/03/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31146078 RECEIVED ON 04/19/2022 12:34:07 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY GALVAN, SAUL ON 04/19/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GALVAN, SAUL ON 04/19/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GALVAN, SAUL ON 04/19/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13036760 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12864781.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GASTELUM, JOHN ON 04/19/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/16/2022 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C11 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Eagle Community Credit Union is a litigant