This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/27/2023 at 03:45:38 (UTC).

SARKIS KHOSHORYAN VS. GENERAL MOTORS, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 SARKIS KHOSHORYAN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS, LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-WJC

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mariam M. Mkrtchyan

Sarkis Khoshoryan

Defendant

General Motors, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MFS Legal Inc.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY KHOSHORYAN, SARKIS; MKRTCHYAN, MARIAM M. ON 01/12/2023

COMPLAINT FILED BY KHOSHORYAN, SARKIS; MKRTCHYAN, MARIAM M. ON 01/12/2023

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KHOSHORYAN, SARKIS; MKRTCHYAN, MARIAM M. ON 01/12/2023

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KHOSHORYAN, SARKIS; MKRTCHYAN, MARIAM M. ON 01/12/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY KHOSHORYAN, SARKIS; MKRTCHYAN, MARIAM M. ON 01/12/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY KHOSHORYAN, SARKIS; MKRTCHYAN, MARIAM M. ON 01/12/2023

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13164326 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12992423.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13164326 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12992423.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/03/2023 AT 10:00:00 AM IN W08 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/03/2023 AT 10:00:00 AM IN W08 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY KHOSHORYAN, SARKIS; MKRTCHYAN, MARIAM M. ON 01/20/2023

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY KHOSHORYAN, SARKIS; MKRTCHYAN, MARIAM M. ON 01/20/2023

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2023
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: RECIO; Department: W08

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY KHOSHORYAN, SARKIS; MKRTCHYAN, MARIAM M. ON 01/20/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31259238 RECEIVED ON 01/20/2023 04:27:46 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/03/2023 AT 10:00:00 AM IN W08 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13164326 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12992423.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21258416 RECEIVED ON 01/12/2023 12:53:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER RECIO, SHEILA ON 01/12/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY KHOSHORYAN, SARKIS; MKRTCHYAN, MARIAM M. ON 01/12/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KHOSHORYAN, SARKIS; MKRTCHYAN, MARIAM M. ON 01/12/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY KHOSHORYAN, SARKIS; MKRTCHYAN, MARIAM M. ON 01/12/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less