This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/31/2017 at 00:15:31 (UTC).

SARAH THOMASON VS. JLE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 SARAH THOMASON filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JLE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SARAH THOMASON

GLEN NIBBE

Defendants

RANDY BECKETT

JLE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2013
  • SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT - ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FILED BY NIBBE, GLEN; THOMASON, SARAH ON 10/22/2013; Filing Party: NIBBE, GLEN; THOMASON, SARAH ON 10/22/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2013
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT CONTESTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2013
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT CONTESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2013
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 09/10/2013 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2013
  • THE COURT ORDERS RANDY BECKETT BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2013
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY (SMALL CLAIMS) FILED BY JLE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC ON 09/10/2013; Filing Party: JLE PROPERTY MANAGEME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - PERSONAL FILED BY THOMASON, SARAH ON 08/28/2013; Filing Party: THOMASON, SARAH ON 08/28/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - PERSONAL FILED BY THOMASON, SARAH ON 08/28/2013; Filing Party: THOMASON, SARAH ON 08/28/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 09/10/2013 AT 01:30:00 PM IN N10 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 04 - SMALL CLAIMS >$1,500<=$5,000 IN THE AMOUNT OF 50.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11430763 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11254635.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 462520 RECEIVED ON 08/12/2013 02:46:27 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY THOMASON, SARAH; NIBBE, GLEN ON 08/12/2013; Filing Party: THOMASON, SARAH; NIBBE, GLEN ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less