This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/15/2018 at 08:59:38 (UTC).

SANTA ANA POLICE OFFICERS ASSOCIATION VS. CITY OF SANTA ANA

Case Summary

On 04/01/2016 SANTA ANA POLICE OFFICERS ASSOCIATION filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CITY OF SANTA ANA. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SANTA ANA POLICE OFFICERS ASSOCIATION

COREY SLAYTON

Defendants

CITY OF SANTA ANA

CARLOS ROJAS

SANTA ANA POLICE DEPARTMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GLAVE W. COREY

Defendant Attorneys

FERGUSON, PRAET & SHERMAN, APC

COTA COLE & HUBER LLP

FERGUSON, PRAET & SHERMAN

 

Court Documents

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 03/01/2018 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 03/01/2018 09:00:00 AM.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4810882 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4810882 REJECTED.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY SANTA ANA POLICE DEPARTMENT ON 01/31/2018

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY SANTA ANA POLICE DEPARTMENT ON 01/31/2018

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY CITY OF SANTA ANA ON 01/31/2018

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY CITY OF SANTA ANA ON 01/31/2018

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1460477 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1460477 REJECTED.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY SLAYTON, COREY; SANTA ANA POLICE OFFICERS ASSOCIATION ON 01/10/2018

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY SLAYTON, COREY; SANTA ANA POLICE OFFICERS ASSOCIATION ON 01/10/2018

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY ROJAS, CARLOS ON 12/28/2017

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY ROJAS, CARLOS ON 12/28/2017

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 12/18/2017 03:15:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 12/18/2017 03:15:00 PM.

CASE REASSIGNED TO MELISSA MCCORMICK EFFECTIVE 12/22/2017.

CASE REASSIGNED TO MELISSA MCCORMICK EFFECTIVE 12/22/2017.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 11/06/2017 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 11/06/2017 09:00:00 AM.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY SANTA ANA POLICE DEPARTMENT ON 10/31/2017

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY SANTA ANA POLICE DEPARTMENT ON 10/31/2017

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY CITY OF SANTA ANA ON 09/13/2017

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY CITY OF SANTA ANA ON 09/13/2017

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 08/07/2017 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 08/07/2017 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 05/01/2017 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 05/01/2017 09:00:00 AM.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4608704 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4608704 REJECTED.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 12/07/2016 09:18:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 12/07/2016 09:18:00 AM.

55 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 03/01/2018 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • STATUS CONFERENCE CONTINUED TO 04/19/2018 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO COURT'S MOTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/19/2018 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4810882 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY SANTA ANA POLICE DEPARTMENT ON 01/31/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY CITY OF SANTA ANA ON 01/31/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4810875 RECEIVED ON 01/31/2018 12:02:06 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1460477 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY SLAYTON, COREY; SANTA ANA POLICE OFFICERS ASSOCIATION ON 01/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4803699 RECEIVED ON 01/10/2018 12:03:05 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
99 More Docket Entries
  • 05/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY SLAYTON, COREY; SANTA ANA POLICE OFFICERS ASSOCIATION ON 05/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY SLAYTON, COREY; SANTA ANA POLICE OFFICERS ASSOCIATION ON 05/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3418613 RECEIVED ON 05/26/2016 06:26:35 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 08/01/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C34 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GOODING, MARTHA ON 04/01/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11946341 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11770496.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SANTA ANA POLICE OFFICERS ASSOCIATION; SLAYTON, COREY ON 04/01/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SANTA ANA POLICE OFFICERS ASSOCIATION; SLAYTON, COREY ON 04/01/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY SANTA ANA POLICE OFFICERS ASSOCIATION; SLAYTON, COREY ON 04/01/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1314597 RECEIVED ON 04/01/2016 04:37:10 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Santa Ana Police Officers Associaton is a litigant

Latest cases where SANTA ANA POLICE DEPARTMENT, an entity is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GLAVE COREY