This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 12/07/2021 at 07:31:44 (UTC).

SAN JOAQUIN HILLS TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY VS. PARSI

Case Summary

On 09/24/2021 SAN JOAQUIN HILLS TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against PARSI. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

San Joaquin Hills Transportation Corridor Agency

Respondent

Michelle V Parsi

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP

 

Court Documents

PETITION - TOLL EVASION FILED BY SAN JOAQUIN HILLS TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 09/24/2021

PETITION - TOLL EVASION FILED BY SAN JOAQUIN HILLS TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 09/24/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SAN JOAQUIN HILLS TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 09/24/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SAN JOAQUIN HILLS TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 09/24/2021

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 09/24/2021.

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 09/24/2021.

JUDGMENT (FOR TOLL EVASION PENALTIES) FILED BY SAN JOAQUIN HILLS TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 10/06/2021

JUDGMENT (FOR TOLL EVASION PENALTIES) FILED BY SAN JOAQUIN HILLS TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 10/06/2021

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketCASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF OTHER CLERK JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketPETITION - TOLL EVASION DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF OTHER CLERK JUDGMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketTHE COURT ENTERS JUDGMENT AS TO PETITION - TOLL EVASION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT (FOR TOLL EVASION PENALTIES) FILED BY SAN JOAQUIN HILLS TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 10/06/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41244739 RECEIVED ON 09/24/2021 02:15:27 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 09/24/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SAN JOAQUIN HILLS TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 09/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION - TOLL EVASION FILED BY SAN JOAQUIN HILLS TRANSPORTATION CORRIDOR AGENCY ON 09/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where San Joaquin Hills Transportation Corridor Agency is a litigant