Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/12/2021 at 16:57:33 (UTC).

SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC VS. DUAL DIAGNOSIS TREATMENT CENTER, INC

Case Summary

On 07/19/2018 SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DUAL DIAGNOSIS TREATMENT CENTER, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC

Defendants

DUAL DIAGNOSIS TREATMENT CENTER, INC

VEDANTA LABORATORIES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KING & PARRET, APC

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 11/19/2018

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 11/19/2018

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12453524 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12277183.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12453524 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12277183.

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 11/15/2018) RECEIVED ON 11/13/2018.

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 11/15/2018) RECEIVED ON 11/13/2018.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1559812 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1559812 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3728315 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3728315 REJECTED.

JUDGMENT FILED BY SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 11/05/2018

JUDGMENT FILED BY SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 11/05/2018

PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 10/17/2018.

PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 10/17/2018.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 10/22/2018

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 10/22/2018

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 09/20/2018

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 09/20/2018

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 09/20/2018

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 09/20/2018

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4889113 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4889113 REJECTED.

AFFIDAVIT - OTHER FILED BY SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 08/13/2018

AFFIDAVIT - OTHER FILED BY SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 08/13/2018

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/16/2018 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C24 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/16/2018 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C24 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 07/30/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 07/30/2018

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER DELANEY, THOMAS ON 07/19/2018.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER DELANEY, THOMAS ON 07/19/2018.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12387316 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12211021.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12387316 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12211021.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 07/19/2018

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 07/19/2018

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 11/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2734498 RECEIVED ON 11/19/2018 12:05:01 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12453524 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12277183.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2732673 RECEIVED ON 11/13/2018 03:17:01 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 11/15/2018) RECEIVED ON 11/13/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1559812 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3728315 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • DocketCASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2701474 RECEIVED ON 08/13/2018 08:13:22 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/16/2018 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C24 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 07/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3693454 RECEIVED ON 07/30/2018 06:28:23 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12387316 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12211021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4867619 RECEIVED ON 07/19/2018 12:31:08 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER DELANEY, THOMAS ON 07/19/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 07/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 07/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 07/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SAN CLEMENTE RRM LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where VEDANTA LABORATORIES, INC., a Delaware corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc. is a litigant