Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/12/2021 at 18:45:02 (UTC).

SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC VS. DUAL DIAGNOSIS TREATMENT CENTER, INC.

Case Summary

On 01/31/2018 SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against DUAL DIAGNOSIS TREATMENT CENTER, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC

Defendants

DUAL DIAGNOSIS TREATMENT CENTER, INC.

VEDANTA LABORATORIES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KING & PARRET, APC

 

Court Documents

WRIT (07/17/2018 ISSUED) RECEIVED ON 07/16/2018.

WRIT (07/17/2018 ISSUED) RECEIVED ON 07/16/2018.

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/14/2018.

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/14/2018.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12368835 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12192608.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12368835 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12192608.

STIPULATION AND ORDER (FOR JUDGMENT) RECEIVED ON 06/14/2018.

STIPULATION AND ORDER (FOR JUDGMENT) RECEIVED ON 06/14/2018.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 06/14/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 06/14/2018

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12360844 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12184614.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12360844 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12184614.

WRIT (ISSUED 6/4/18) RECEIVED ON 06/01/2018.

WRIT (ISSUED 6/4/18) RECEIVED ON 06/01/2018.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1502875 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1502875 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3669883 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3669883 REJECTED.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12337478 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12161208.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12337478 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12161208.

WRIT (ISSUED 4/25/18) RECEIVED ON 04/24/2018.

WRIT (ISSUED 4/25/18) RECEIVED ON 04/24/2018.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 04/19/2018

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 04/19/2018

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12317016 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12140786.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12317016 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12140786.

WRIT (ISSUED 3/19/18) RECEIVED ON 03/19/2018.

WRIT (ISSUED 3/19/18) RECEIVED ON 03/19/2018.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 03/16/2018

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 03/16/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 02/14/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 02/14/2018

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 01/31/2018

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 01/31/2018

COMPLAINT FILED BY SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 01/31/2018

COMPLAINT FILED BY SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 01/31/2018

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 01/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12385097 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12208827.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2691442 RECEIVED ON 07/16/2018 02:14:51 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT (07/17/2018 ISSUED) RECEIVED ON 07/16/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12383435 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12207165.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4865300 RECEIVED ON 07/12/2018 04:33:54 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 7/13/18) RECEIVED ON 07/12/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1518488 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 07/11/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2689880 RECEIVED ON 07/11/2018 12:00:15 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 03/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 03/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 03/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 02/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1468982 RECEIVED ON 02/14/2018 12:04:41 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER UNASSIGNED ON 01/31/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12291990 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12115737.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 01/31/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 01/31/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 01/31/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3631929 RECEIVED ON 01/31/2018 02:55:49 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SAN CLEMENTE RRM LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where VEDANTA LABORATORIES, INC., a Delaware corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc. is a litigant