Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/28/2017 at 02:01:58 (UTC).

SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC VS. DON ROBERTO JEWELERS, INC.

Case Summary

On 12/17/2013 SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DON ROBERTO JEWELERS, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC

Defendant

DON ROBERTO JEWELERS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KING PARRET & DROSTE, LLP

Defendant Attorney

SALAMIRAD, MORROW, TIMPANE & DUNN LLP

 

Court Documents

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR ADJUDICATION 11/24/2014 10:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR ADJUDICATION 11/24/2014 10:30:00 AM.

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 08/21/2014

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 08/21/2014

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 04/30/2014

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 04/30/2014

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 04/30/2014

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 04/30/2014

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DON ROBERTO JEWELERS, INC. ON 04/25/2014

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DON ROBERTO JEWELERS, INC. ON 04/25/2014

NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY DON ROBERTO JEWELERS, INC. ON 04/25/2014

NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY DON ROBERTO JEWELERS, INC. ON 04/25/2014

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION FILED BY DON ROBERTO JEWELERS, INC. ON 04/25/2014

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION FILED BY DON ROBERTO JEWELERS, INC. ON 04/25/2014

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 04/23/2014

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 04/23/2014

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 03/10/2014 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 03/10/2014 08:30:00 AM.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 02/24/2014

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 02/24/2014

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DON ROBERTO JEWELERS, INC. ON 02/21/2014

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DON ROBERTO JEWELERS, INC. ON 02/21/2014

NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND HEARING FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER AND WRITS OF ATTACHMENT FILED BY SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 01/24/2014

NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND HEARING FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER AND WRITS OF ATTACHMENT FILED BY SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 01/24/2014

APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 01/24/2014

APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 01/24/2014

NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 01/15/2014

NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 01/15/2014

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 01/08/2014

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 01/08/2014

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/10/2014 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C26 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/10/2014 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C26 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11513614 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11337422.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11513614 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11337422.

COMPLAINT FILED BY SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 12/17/2013

COMPLAINT FILED BY SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 12/17/2013

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 04/08/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2015
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4358315 RECEIVED ON 04/08/2015 04:19:49 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2015
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2015
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 12/03/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2014
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3222739 RECEIVED ON 12/03/2014 04:05:40 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR ADJUDICATION 11/24/2014 10:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2014
  • THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE IS SCHEDULED FOR 05/18/2015 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT C26.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2014
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE SCHEDULED FOR 05/18/2015 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C26 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
71 More Docket Entries
  • 01/16/2014
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3104600 RECEIVED ON 01/15/2014 04:54:22 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 01/08/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2014
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4127948 RECEIVED ON 01/08/2014 12:03:48 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/10/2014 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C26 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER LEWIS, GREGORY ON 12/17/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11513614 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11337422.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 12/17/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 12/17/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY SAN CLEMENTE RRM, LLC ON 12/17/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 394235 RECEIVED ON 12/17/2013 02:02:15 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SAN CLEMENTE RRM LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where DON ROBERTO JEWELERS INC is a litigant