This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/15/2022 at 06:19:22 (UTC).

SAMANTHA WHITE VS. KINDRED HOSPITAL WESTMINSTER

Case Summary

On 04/05/2021 SAMANTHA WHITE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against KINDRED HOSPITAL WESTMINSTER. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Samantha White

Susanne White

Karmen White

Claudia Weger

Defendants

Kindred Hospital Westminster

THC-Orange County, Inc.

THC Orange County LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Case Barnett Law

Schumann Rosenberg & Arevalo LLP

Defendant Attorney

Giovanniello Law Group

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY THC ORANGE COUNTY LLC ON 12/09/2021

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY THC ORANGE COUNTY LLC ON 12/09/2021

PROPOSED ORDER (NOT SIGNED) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 10/01/2021

PROPOSED ORDER (NOT SIGNED) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 10/01/2021

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 12/03/2021 10:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 12/03/2021 10:00:00 AM.

REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY THC ORANGE COUNTY LLC ON 11/24/2021

REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY THC ORANGE COUNTY LLC ON 11/24/2021

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 11/19/2021 11:06:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 11/19/2021 11:06:00 AM.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY WEGER, CLAUDIA; WHITE, KARMEN; WHITE, SAMANTHA; WHITE, SUSANNE ON 11/18/2021

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY WEGER, CLAUDIA; WHITE, KARMEN; WHITE, SAMANTHA; WHITE, SUSANNE ON 11/18/2021

OPPOSITION FILED BY WEGER, CLAUDIA; WHITE, KARMEN; WHITE, SAMANTHA; WHITE, SUSANNE ON 11/18/2021

OPPOSITION FILED BY WEGER, CLAUDIA; WHITE, KARMEN; WHITE, SAMANTHA; WHITE, SUSANNE ON 11/18/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY WHITE, KARMEN; WHITE, SAMANTHA; WHITE, SUSANNE ON 11/18/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY WHITE, KARMEN; WHITE, SAMANTHA; WHITE, SUSANNE ON 11/18/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12952804 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12780694.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12952804 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12780694.

MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION FILED BY THC ORANGE COUNTY LLC ON 10/01/2021

MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION FILED BY THC ORANGE COUNTY LLC ON 10/01/2021

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/01/2021

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/01/2021

NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY THC ORANGE COUNTY LLC ON 10/01/2021

NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY THC ORANGE COUNTY LLC ON 10/01/2021

PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY THC ORANGE COUNTY LLC ON 10/01/2021

PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY THC ORANGE COUNTY LLC ON 10/01/2021

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY THC ORANGE COUNTY LLC ON 10/01/2021

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY THC ORANGE COUNTY LLC ON 10/01/2021

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY THC ORANGE COUNTY LLC ON 10/01/2021

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY THC ORANGE COUNTY LLC ON 10/01/2021

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY THC ORANGE COUNTY LLC ON 10/01/2021

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY THC ORANGE COUNTY LLC ON 10/01/2021

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 09/10/2021 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 09/10/2021 09:00:00 AM.

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2022
  • HearingDescription: STATUS CONFERENCE RE: ADR; Judge: SERVINO; Department: C21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RULING FILED BY THC ORANGE COUNTY LLC ON 12/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31095393 RECEIVED ON 12/09/2021 10:27:17 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1901162 RECEIVED ON 10/01/2021 01:12:48 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 12/03/2021 10:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketTHE STATUS CONFERENCE RE: ADR IS SCHEDULED FOR 06/03/2022 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT C21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketSTATUS CONFERENCE RE: ADR SCHEDULED FOR 06/03/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C21 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY THC ORANGE COUNTY LLC ON 11/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41268163 RECEIVED ON 11/24/2021 07:39:44 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31005895 RECEIVED ON 04/20/2021 02:40:19 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31001854 RECEIVED ON 04/09/2021 11:37:34 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY WEGER, CLAUDIA; WHITE, KARMEN; WHITE, SAMANTHA; WHITE, SUSANNE ON 04/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1832653 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/10/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C21 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12869172 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12696831.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21002760 RECEIVED ON 04/05/2021 02:47:13 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SERVINO, DEBORAH ON 04/05/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY WHITE, SAMANTHA; WHITE, KARMEN; WHITE, SUSANNE; WEGER, CLAUDIA ON 04/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY WHITE, SAMANTHA; WHITE, KARMEN; WHITE, SUSANNE; WEGER, CLAUDIA ON 04/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KINDRED HOSPITAL-WESTMINSTER is a litigant

Latest cases where THC-ORANGE COUNTY INC. is a litigant