This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 07/13/2021 at 03:25:20 (UTC).

SAMANTHA N. NEWTON VS. ANAHEIM DUCKS HOCKEY CLUB, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/06/2018 SAMANTHA N NEWTON filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against ANAHEIM DUCKS HOCKEY CLUB, LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAMANTHA N. NEWTON

Defendants

LA HONDA CENTER, LLC

LIVE NATION ENTERTAINMENT, INC

ANAHEIM DUCKS HOCKEY CLUB, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE LAW OFFICE OF CARSON C. NEWTON

Defendant Attorney

Sheppard, Mullin, Richter & Hampton LLP

Other Attorneys

SHEPPARD, MULLIN, RICHTER & HAMPTON LL

 

Court Documents

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/16/2019 09:50:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/16/2019 09:50:00 AM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,305.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12481382 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12305072.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,305.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12481382 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12305072.

NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT FILED BY ANAHEIM DUCKS HOCKEY CLUB, LLC; LA HONDA CENTER, LLC; LIVE NATION ENTERTAINMENT, INC ON 12/21/2018

NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT FILED BY ANAHEIM DUCKS HOCKEY CLUB, LLC; LA HONDA CENTER, LLC; LIVE NATION ENTERTAINMENT, INC ON 12/21/2018

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2741910 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2741910 REJECTED.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 12/14/2018 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 12/14/2018 09:00:00 AM.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY NEWTON, SAMANTHA N. ON 12/13/2018

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY NEWTON, SAMANTHA N. ON 12/13/2018

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY NEWTON, SAMANTHA N. ON 11/20/2018

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY NEWTON, SAMANTHA N. ON 11/20/2018

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4908738 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4908738 REJECTED.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 12/14/2018 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C18 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 12/14/2018 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C18 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HOWARD, THEODORE ON 09/06/2018.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HOWARD, THEODORE ON 09/06/2018.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12414492 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12238202.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12414492 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12238202.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY NEWTON, SAMANTHA N. ON 09/06/2018

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY NEWTON, SAMANTHA N. ON 09/06/2018

COMPLAINT FILED BY NEWTON, SAMANTHA N. ON 09/06/2018

COMPLAINT FILED BY NEWTON, SAMANTHA N. ON 09/06/2018

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/16/2019 09:50:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketTHE CASE IS REASSIGNED TO THE OMNIBUS CALENDAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketCASE REASSIGNED TO OMNI EFFECTIVE 12/21/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,305.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12481382 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12305072.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2745134 RECEIVED ON 12/21/2018 12:31:16 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT FILED BY ANAHEIM DUCKS HOCKEY CLUB, LLC; LA HONDA CENTER, LLC; LIVE NATION ENTERTAINMENT, INC ON 12/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2741910 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 12/14/2018 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CONTINUED TO 02/01/2019 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO PARTY'S MOTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 12/13/2018
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1571163 RECEIVED ON 12/13/2018 08:28:18 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2735169 RECEIVED ON 11/20/2018 03:38:14 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY NEWTON, SAMANTHA N. ON 11/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4908738 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 12/14/2018 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C18 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12414492 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12238202.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1537630 RECEIVED ON 09/06/2018 01:26:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HOWARD, THEODORE ON 09/06/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY NEWTON, SAMANTHA N. ON 09/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY NEWTON, SAMANTHA N. ON 09/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ANAHEIM DUCKS HOCKEY CLUB is a litigant

Latest cases where LIVE NATION ENTERTAINMENT INC. is a litigant