This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/11/2019 at 06:19:04 (UTC).

SALVATORE AGRUSA VS MARIELLA AGRUSA

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 SALVATORE AGRUSA filed a Family - Legal Separation lawsuit against MARIELLA AGRUSA. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The Judge overseeing this case is COOPER, SCOTT B.. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8353

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Legal Separation

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

Judge Details

Judge

COOPER, SCOTT B.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

AGRUSA, SALVATORE

Respondent

AGRUSA, MARIELLA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

FEIG LAW FIRM

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2019
  • HEARING - RFO - CUSTODY / VISITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • HEARING - RFO - CHILD / SPOUSAL SUPPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • APPOINTMENT - CHILD CUSTODY INVESTIGATION - FULL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • RFO - CHILD SUPPORT / SPOUSAL SUPPORT 02/20/2019; Filing Party: AGRUSA, MARIELLA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • STIPULATION & ORDER 01/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • MINUTE ORDER 01/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • HEARING - RFO - CUSTODY / VISITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • STIPULATION & ORDER 12/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • ORDER - STANDING ORDERS 12/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • ORDER - APPOINTING CHILD CUSTODY EVALUATOR 12/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 02/15/2018
  • NOTICE & ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT 02/15/2018; Filing Party: AGRUSA, SALVATORE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • PETITION - AMENDED 11/15/2017; Filing Party: AGRUSA, SALVATORE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • SUMMONS - AMENDED PETITION 11/15/2017; Filing Party: AGRUSA, SALVATORE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • NOTICE & ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT 10/30/2017; Filing Party: AGRUSA, SALVATORE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 10/30/2017; Filing Party: AGRUSA, SALVATORE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 10/10/2017; Filing Party: AGRUSA, SALVATORE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 10/10/2017; Filing Party: AGRUSA, SALVATORE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 10/10/2017; Filing Party: AGRUSA, SALVATORE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 10/10/2017 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: AGRUSA, SALVATORE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • SUMMONS 10/10/2017; Filing Party: AGRUSA, SALVATORE

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.