This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 11/05/2021 at 07:50:47 (UTC).

SALVADOR QUINTERO VS. METRO-AUTO

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 SALVADOR QUINTERO filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against METRO-AUTO. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Salvador Quintero

Defendants

Ally Financial, Inc.

Metro-Auto

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Law Offices of Robert B. Mobasseri, P.C.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY QUINTERO, SALVADOR ON 10/12/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY QUINTERO, SALVADOR ON 10/12/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY QUINTERO, SALVADOR ON 10/12/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY QUINTERO, SALVADOR ON 10/12/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY QUINTERO, SALVADOR ON 10/12/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY QUINTERO, SALVADOR ON 10/12/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12956322 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12784219.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12956322 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12784219.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/23/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C33 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/23/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C33 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY QUINTERO, SALVADOR ON 10/19/2021

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY QUINTERO, SALVADOR ON 10/19/2021

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY QUINTERO, SALVADOR ON 10/19/2021

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY QUINTERO, SALVADOR ON 10/19/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2022
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: CRANDALL; Department: C33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY QUINTERO, SALVADOR ON 10/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31075896 RECEIVED ON 10/19/2021 01:14:33 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY QUINTERO, SALVADOR ON 10/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41253923 RECEIVED ON 10/19/2021 01:14:32 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/23/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C33 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12956322 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12784219.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1904875 RECEIVED ON 10/12/2021 11:57:50 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER CRANDALL, JAMES ON 10/12/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY QUINTERO, SALVADOR ON 10/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY QUINTERO, SALVADOR ON 10/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY QUINTERO, SALVADOR ON 10/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where METRO-AUTO is a litigant

Latest cases where Ally Financial Inc. is a litigant