This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/10/2019 at 10:51:17 (UTC).

SALLY KAWAMOTO VS RYU KAWAMOTO

Case Summary

On 06/15/2017 SALLY KAWAMOTO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against RYU KAWAMOTO. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5008

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KAWAMOTO, SALLY ANN

Respondent

KAWAMOTO, RYU ERIC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SHUFF LAW FIRM

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 08/11/2017; Filing Party: KAWAMOTO, SALLY ANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 07/27/2017; Filing Party: KAWAMOTO, SALLY ANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 07/27/2017; Filing Party: KAWAMOTO, SALLY ANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • JUDGMENT - FAMILY CODE 2336 07/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT 07/24/2017; Filing Party: KAWAMOTO, SALLY ANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • STIPULATION & WAIVERS (NO FEE) 07/24/2017; Filing Party: KAWAMOTO, SALLY ANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • WAIVER - FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 07/24/2017; Filing Party: KAWAMOTO, SALLY ANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 07/24/2017 preliminary; Filing Party: KAWAMOTO, RYU ERIC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 07/24/2017; Filing Party: KAWAMOTO, SALLY ANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 07/24/2017; Filing Party: KAWAMOTO, RYU ERIC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 07/06/2017; Filing Party: KAWAMOTO, SALLY ANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • NOTICE & ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT 06/28/2017; Filing Party: KAWAMOTO, SALLY ANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 06/23/2017; Filing Party: KAWAMOTO, RYU ERIC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 06/23/2017; Filing Party: KAWAMOTO, RYU ERIC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • RESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 06/23/2017 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: KAWAMOTO, RYU ERIC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 06/21/2017 preliminary; Filing Party: KAWAMOTO, SALLY ANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 06/15/2017; Filing Party: KAWAMOTO, SALLY ANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 06/15/2017; Filing Party: KAWAMOTO, SALLY ANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • SUMMONS 06/15/2017; Filing Party: KAWAMOTO, SALLY ANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 06/15/2017 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: KAWAMOTO, SALLY ANN

    Read MoreRead Less