This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/25/2019 at 12:12:08 (UTC).

SALLAM V BATTIEST

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 SALLAM filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BATTIEST. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7488

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Usama S. Sallam

Petitioner

SALLAM, USAMA SALLAM ABD ELHA

Defendant

Destony S. Battiest

Respondent

BATTIEST, DESTONY SHAZELLE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2014
  • DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT 03/07/2014 16:15:00 # Pages:3; Filing Party: SALLAM, USAMA SALLAM ABD ELHA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2014
  • JUDGMENT 03/07/2014 16:15:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: SALLAM, USAMA SALLAM ABD ELHA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2014
  • STIPULATION - TEMPORARY JUDGE 03/07/2014 16:15:00 # Pages:1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2014
  • NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 03/07/2014 15:53:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: SALLAM, USAMA SALLAM ABD ELHA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2014
  • MINUTE ORDER 03/07/2014 08:15:00 # Pages:1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2014
  • JUDGMENT - DEFAULT 03/07/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2014
  • HRG - DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2014
  • MEMORANDUM - SET HEARING 02/07/2014 09:17:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: SALLAM, USAMA SALLAM ABD ELHA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2014
  • PROPERTY DECLARATION 01/23/2014 15:48:00 # Pages:4; Filing Party: SALLAM, USAMA SALLAM ABD ELHA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2014
  • PROPERTY DECLARATION 01/23/2014 15:48:00 # Pages:4; Filing Party: SALLAM, USAMA SALLAM ABD ELHA

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 12/18/2013
  • NOTICE - PROCEDURAL ASSISTANCE CONFERENCE 12/18/2013 14:33:00 GENERATED BY THE 100 - 120 DAY PROCEDURAL ASSISTANCE CONFERENCE NOTICE # Pages:1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2013
  • SUMMONS - AMENDED PETITION 10/01/2013 08:31:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: SALLAM, USAMA SALLAM ABD ELHA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2013
  • PETITION / COMPLAINT - AMENDED 10/01/2013 08:30:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: SALLAM, USAMA SALLAM ABD ELHA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2013
  • APPLICATION - PUBLICATION / POSTING 09/23/2013 08:21:00 # Pages:12; Filing Party: SALLAM, USAMA SALLAM ABD ELHA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • ORDER - FEE WAIVER GRANTED BY CLERK 08/12/2013 09:16:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: SALLAM, USAMA SALLAM ABD ELHA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 08/12/2013 09:21:00 # Pages:4; Filing Party: SALLAM, USAMA SALLAM ABD ELHA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 08/12/2013 09:20:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: SALLAM, USAMA SALLAM ABD ELHA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • SUMMONS 08/12/2013 09:20:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: SALLAM, USAMA SALLAM ABD ELHA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 08/12/2013 09:18:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: SALLAM, USAMA SALLAM ABD ELHA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • REQUEST - WAIVE COURT FEES 08/12/2013 12:11:00 GRANTED # Pages:2; Filing Party: SALLAM, USAMA SALLAM ABD ELHA

    Read MoreRead Less