This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/05/2023 at 20:03:53 (UTC).

SAGE ASSOCIATES, INC. VS. AFAKORI, INC.

Case Summary

On 11/23/2022 SAGE ASSOCIATES, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AFAKORI, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAGE ASSOCIATES, INC.

Defendants

AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNI

AFAKORI, INC.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2023
  • HearingDescription: SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL; Department: C04

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 01/20/2023 08:00:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS TRIAL CONTINUED TO 02/23/2023 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT C4 PURSUANT TO COURT'S MOTION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21256997 RECEIVED ON 01/10/2023 09:53:48 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY SAGE ASSOCIATES, INC. ON 01/10/2023; Filing Party: SAGE ASSOCIATES, INC. ON 01/10/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31253020 REJECTED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketDECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY SAGE ASSOCIATES, INC. ON 12/13/2022; Filing Party: SAGE ASSOCIATES, INC. ON 12/13/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY SAGE ASSOCIATES, INC. ON 12/13/2022; Filing Party: SAGE ASSOCIATES, INC. ON 12/13/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 01/20/2023 AT 08:00:00 AM IN VCC5 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 04 - SMALL CLAIMS >$1,500<=$5,000 IN THE AMOUNT OF 50.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13141547 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12969641.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31236446 RECEIVED ON 11/23/2022 06:36:58 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketAUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY (SMALL CLAIMS) FILED BY SAGE ASSOCIATES, INC. ON 11/23/2022; Filing Party: SAGE ASSOCIATES, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY SAGE ASSOCIATES, INC. ON 11/23/2022; Filing Party: SAGE ASSOCIATES, INC. ON 11/23/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less