This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:52:42 (UTC).

SADR LAW FIRM, APLC VS. SEYED ALI SEYEDI TABARI

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 SADR LAW FIRM, APLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SEYED ALI SEYEDI TABARI. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SADR LAW FIRM, APLC

Defendants

MOE BEHROOZIAN

SEYED ALI SEYEDI TABARI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE SADR LAW FIRM, APLC

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SADR LAW FIRM, APLC ON 03/17/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SADR LAW FIRM, APLC ON 03/17/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927545 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751770.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927545 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751770.

COMPLAINT FILED BY SADR LAW FIRM, APLC ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY SADR LAW FIRM, APLC ON 02/26/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY SADR LAW FIRM, APLC ON 07/22/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY SADR LAW FIRM, APLC ON 07/22/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SADR LAW FIRM, APLC ON 03/21/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SADR LAW FIRM, APLC ON 03/21/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/16/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/16/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2016
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2016
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY SADR LAW FIRM, APLC ON 07/22/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4579981 RECEIVED ON 07/22/2016 10:26:20 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/16/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SADR LAW FIRM, APLC ON 03/21/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3393408 RECEIVED ON 03/21/2016 02:15:11 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SADR LAW FIRM, APLC ON 03/17/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1310530 RECEIVED ON 03/17/2016 02:06:06 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927545 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751770.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY SADR LAW FIRM, APLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1306949 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 11:30:24 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.