This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/13/2022 at 06:40:25 (UTC).

SABY BRITO VS. MV PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION, INC.

Case Summary

On 12/29/2021 SABY BRITO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against MV PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Civil Complex Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CXC

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Saby Brito

Defendants

MV Public Transportation, Inc.

MV Transportation, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jackson APC

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY BRITO, SABY ON 12/29/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY BRITO, SABY ON 12/29/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BRITO, SABY ON 12/29/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BRITO, SABY ON 12/29/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BRITO, SABY ON 12/29/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BRITO, SABY ON 12/29/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12989318 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12817237.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12989318 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12817237.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/20/2022 01:33:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/20/2022 01:33:00 PM.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2022
  • HearingDescription: STATUS CONFERENCE; Judge: WILSON; Department: CX102

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketSTATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/29/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN CX102 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketTHE STATUS CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 04/29/2022 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT CX102.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/20/2022 01:33:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31102260 RECEIVED ON 12/29/2021 04:16:49 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12989318 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12817237.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY BRITO, SABY ON 12/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BRITO, SABY ON 12/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BRITO, SABY ON 12/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER WILSON, PETER ON 12/29/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MV TRANSPORTATION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where MV PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant