Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/11/2019 at 09:13:38 (UTC).

SABRINA SILVA VS. ETIVISTA CONCRETE, INC.

Case Summary

On 05/01/2018 SABRINA SILVA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ETIVISTA CONCRETE, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SABRINA SILVA

Defendants, Others and Cross Defendants

ETIVISTA CONCRETE, INC.

METROPOLIS GARDENS, LLC

SUNCOAST POST-TENSION, LP

PACIFIC COAST CLEANING, INC.

Torres General, Inc.

Seal Electric, Inc.

TOP OPERATORS, LLC

QUALITY REINFORCING, INC.

JD REINFORCING COMPANY

Quality Steel Fabricators, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TIMOTHY J. RYAN & ASSOCIATES

Defendant, Other and Cross Defendant Attorneys

BULLARD, BROWN & BEAL, LLP

LYNBERG & WATKINS

Prindle, Goetz, Barnes & Reinholtz LLP

Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP

Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

Other Attorneys

PRINDLE DECKER & AMARO

 

Court Documents

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/19/2019

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/19/2019

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY SILVA, SABRINA ON 06/12/2019

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY SILVA, SABRINA ON 06/12/2019

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY SILVA, SABRINA ON 06/12/2019

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY SILVA, SABRINA ON 06/12/2019

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 1) FILED BY SILVA, SABRINA ON 06/07/2019

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 1) FILED BY SILVA, SABRINA ON 06/07/2019

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY METROPOLIS GARDENS, LLC ON 05/20/2019

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY METROPOLIS GARDENS, LLC ON 05/20/2019

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2785082 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2785082 REJECTED.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12514013 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12337732.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12514013 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12337732.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/11/2019.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/11/2019.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY QUALITY STEEL FABRICATORS, INC. ON 09/12/2018

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY QUALITY STEEL FABRICATORS, INC. ON 09/12/2018

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY QUALITY STEEL FABRICATORS, INC. ON 08/28/2018

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY QUALITY STEEL FABRICATORS, INC. ON 08/28/2018

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY METROPOLIS GARDENS, LLC ON 08/16/2018

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY METROPOLIS GARDENS, LLC ON 08/16/2018

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY TOP OPERATORS, LLC ON 07/27/2018

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY TOP OPERATORS, LLC ON 07/27/2018

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12374730 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12198480.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12374730 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12198480.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY METROPOLIS GARDENS, LLC ON 05/23/2018

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY METROPOLIS GARDENS, LLC ON 05/23/2018

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3670669 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3670669 REJECTED.

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY METROPOLIS GARDENS, LLC ON 05/23/2018

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY METROPOLIS GARDENS, LLC ON 05/23/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY SILVA, SABRINA ON 05/23/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY SILVA, SABRINA ON 05/23/2018

84 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4992262 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/03/2020 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • EX PARTE RESTORE TO 01/03/2020 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/19/2019 02:18:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • JURY TRIAL CONTINUED TO 01/13/2020 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO COURT'S MOTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • EX PARTE CONTINUED TO 01/03/2020 AT 08:30 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO COURT'S MOTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 01/13/2020 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • EX PARTE SCHEDULED FOR 01/03/2020 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • EX PARTE SCHEDULED FOR 07/23/2019 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
129 More Docket Entries
  • 05/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY METROPOLIS GARDENS, LLC ON 05/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2674133 RECEIVED ON 05/23/2018 01:58:48 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SILVA, SABRINA ON 05/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3663064 RECEIVED ON 05/02/2018 10:47:19 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MCCORMICK, MELISSA ON 05/01/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12341528 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12165258.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SILVA, SABRINA ON 05/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SILVA, SABRINA ON 05/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY SILVA, SABRINA ON 05/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1494651 RECEIVED ON 05/01/2018 02:26:24 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where QUALITY REINFORCING INC is a litigant

Latest cases where TORRES GENERAL INC is a litigant

Latest cases where PACIFIC COAST CLEANING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where SUNCOAST POST-TENSION, LTD., A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant