This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/07/2023 at 03:41:30 (UTC).

S. K. VS. DOE 1

Case Summary

On 12/23/2022 S K filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DOE 1. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

S. K.

Defendant

Doe 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Herman Law

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY K., S. ON 12/23/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY K., S. ON 12/23/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY K., S. ON 12/23/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY K., S. ON 12/23/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY K., S. ON 12/23/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY K., S. ON 12/23/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13156846 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12984943.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13156846 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12984943.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/25/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/25/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/23/2023

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/23/2023

NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY K., S. ON 02/23/2023

NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY K., S. ON 02/23/2023

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13183270 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13011397.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13183270 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13011397.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 02/27/2023 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 02/27/2023 01:30:00 PM.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

ORDER - OTHER FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 02/28/2023

ORDER - OTHER FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 02/28/2023

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2023
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: DOURBETAS; Department: C25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21276404 RECEIVED ON 02/23/2023 04:10:21 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 02/28/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 02/27/2023 01:30:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketEX PARTE SCHEDULED FOR 02/27/2023 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13183270 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13011397.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31273754 RECEIVED ON 02/23/2023 04:10:16 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY K., S. ON 02/23/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketDECLARATION - OTHER RECEIVED ON 02/23/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketDECLARATION - OTHER RECEIVED ON 02/23/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketEX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY K., S. ON 02/23/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/23/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/25/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13156846 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12984943.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41427264 RECEIVED ON 12/23/2022 04:43:29 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER DOURBETAS, NICO ON 12/23/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY K., S. ON 12/23/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY K., S. ON 12/23/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY K., S. ON 12/23/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less