This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 12/07/2021 at 08:42:27 (UTC).

RUSSELL SIGLER, INC. VS. NORMAN S. WRIGHT CLIMATEC MECHANICAL EQUIPMENT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 RUSSELL SIGLER, INC filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against NORMAN S WRIGHT CLIMATEC MECHANICAL EQUIPMENT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA, LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Russell Sigler, Inc.

Defendants

Norman S. Wright Climatec Mechanical Equipment of Southern California, LLC

Adam Helliwell

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

K&L Gates LLP

Defendant Attorney

Klinedinst PC

 

Court Documents

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ADR REVIEW HEARING 10/29/2021 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ADR REVIEW HEARING 10/29/2021 09:00:00 AM.

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ADR REVIEW HEARING 06/18/2021 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ADR REVIEW HEARING 06/18/2021 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ADR REVIEW HEARING 05/07/2021 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ADR REVIEW HEARING 05/07/2021 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR ORDER TO STAY PROCEEDINGS 01/25/2021 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR ORDER TO STAY PROCEEDINGS 01/25/2021 01:30:00 PM.

PROPOSED ORDER (NOT SIGNED) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 11/25/2020

PROPOSED ORDER (NOT SIGNED) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 11/25/2020

OBJECTION FILED BY RUSSELL SIGLER, INC. ON 01/20/2021

OBJECTION FILED BY RUSSELL SIGLER, INC. ON 01/20/2021

REPLY - OTHER FILED BY NORMAN S. WRIGHT CLIMATEC MECHANICAL EQUIPMENT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA, LLC ON 01/15/2021

REPLY - OTHER FILED BY NORMAN S. WRIGHT CLIMATEC MECHANICAL EQUIPMENT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA, LLC ON 01/15/2021

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION FILED BY RUSSELL SIGLER, INC. ON 01/11/2021

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION FILED BY RUSSELL SIGLER, INC. ON 01/11/2021

OPPOSITION FILED BY RUSSELL SIGLER, INC. ON 01/11/2021

OPPOSITION FILED BY RUSSELL SIGLER, INC. ON 01/11/2021

NOTICE - OTHER (OF ENTRY OF ORDER) FILED BY RUSSELL SIGLER, INC. ON 12/28/2020

NOTICE - OTHER (OF ENTRY OF ORDER) FILED BY RUSSELL SIGLER, INC. ON 12/28/2020

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12823281 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12650380.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12823281 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12650380.

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER (REJECTED) FILED BY RUSSELL SIGLER, INC. ON 12/21/2020

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER (REJECTED) FILED BY RUSSELL SIGLER, INC. ON 12/21/2020

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12823067 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12650166.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12823067 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12650166.

STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY RUSSELL SIGLER, INC. ON 12/21/2020

STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY RUSSELL SIGLER, INC. ON 12/21/2020

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 12/21/2020 10:25:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 12/21/2020 10:25:00 AM.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY NORMAN S. WRIGHT CLIMATEC MECHANICAL EQUIPMENT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA, LLC; HELLIWELL, ADAM ON 11/25/2020

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY NORMAN S. WRIGHT CLIMATEC MECHANICAL EQUIPMENT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA, LLC; HELLIWELL, ADAM ON 11/25/2020

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2022
  • HearingDescription: ADR REVIEW HEARING; Department: C34

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR ADR REVIEW HEARING 10/29/2021 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketADR REVIEW HEARING CONTINUED TO 01/28/2022 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO COURT'S MOTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketADR REVIEW HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 01/28/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C34 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketADR REVIEW HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 10/29/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C34 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR ADR REVIEW HEARING 06/18/2021 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketADR REVIEW HEARING CONTINUED TO 09/17/2021 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO PARTY'S MOTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketADR REVIEW HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 09/17/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C34 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR ADR REVIEW HEARING 05/07/2021 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ORDER TO STAY PROCEEDINGS FILED BY NORMAN S. WRIGHT CLIMATEC MECHANICAL EQUIPMENT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA, LLC; HELLIWELL, ADAM ON 11/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/22/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C34 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY RUSSELL SIGLER, INC. ON 09/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2943624 RECEIVED ON 09/28/2020 12:18:50 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12786448 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12613307.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41118075 RECEIVED ON 09/25/2020 07:39:24 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER ZELTZER, NANCY ON 09/25/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY RUSSELL SIGLER, INC. ON 09/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY RUSSELL SIGLER, INC. ON 09/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NORMAN S. WRIGHT CLIMATEC MECHANICAL EQUIPMENT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Russell Sigler Inc is a litigant