This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 12/07/2021 at 08:42:17 (UTC).

RUSSELL SIGLER, INC. VS. NORMAN S. WRIGHT CLIMATEC MECHANICAL EQUIPMENT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 RUSSELL SIGLER, INC filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against NORMAN S WRIGHT CLIMATEC MECHANICAL EQUIPMENT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA, LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Russell Sigler, Inc.

Defendants

Norman S. Wright Climatec Mechanical Equipment of Southern California, LLC

Adam Helliwell

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

K&L Gates LLP

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY RUSSELL SIGLER, INC. ON 09/25/2020

COMPLAINT FILED BY RUSSELL SIGLER, INC. ON 09/25/2020

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY RUSSELL SIGLER, INC. ON 09/25/2020

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY RUSSELL SIGLER, INC. ON 09/25/2020

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12786453 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12613312.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12786453 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12613312.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET SUBMITTED BY RUSSELL SIGLER, INC. REJECTED ON 09/30/2020.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET SUBMITTED BY RUSSELL SIGLER, INC. REJECTED ON 09/30/2020.

JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 06/05/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C12 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 06/05/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C12 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/05/2023 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C12 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/05/2023 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C12 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY RUSSELL SIGLER, INC. ON 10/16/2020

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY RUSSELL SIGLER, INC. ON 10/16/2020

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY RUSSELL SIGLER, INC. ON 11/05/2021

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY RUSSELL SIGLER, INC. ON 11/05/2021

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY RUSSELL SIGLER, INC. ON 11/08/2021

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY RUSSELL SIGLER, INC. ON 11/08/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY RUSSELL SIGLER, INC. ON 11/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21086602 RECEIVED ON 11/08/2021 11:58:15 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY RUSSELL SIGLER, INC. ON 11/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41261298 RECEIVED ON 11/05/2021 12:59:45 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41124457 RECEIVED ON 10/16/2020 03:01:36 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY RUSSELL SIGLER, INC. ON 10/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/05/2023 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C12 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 06/05/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C12 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET SUBMITTED BY RUSSELL SIGLER, INC. REJECTED ON 09/30/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12786453 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12613312.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3940170 RECEIVED ON 09/25/2020 08:11:31 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MELZER, LAYNE ON 09/25/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY RUSSELL SIGLER, INC. ON 09/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY RUSSELL SIGLER, INC. ON 09/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NORMAN S. WRIGHT CLIMATEC MECHANICAL EQUIPMENT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Russell Sigler Inc is a litigant