This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 12/08/2022 at 04:49:49 (UTC).

RUMBA ROOM LIVE ANAHEIM, LLC VS. STC GARDENWALK, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/14/2022 RUMBA ROOM LIVE ANAHEIM, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against STC GARDENWALK, LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rumba Room Live Anaheim, LLC

Defendants

House Of Blues Anaheim Restaurant Corp.

Knights Plumbing, Inc.

Live Nation Entertainment, Inc.

Pentair Residential Filtration, LLC

STC Gardenwalk, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FitzGerald Kreditor Bolduc Risbrough LLP

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY RUMBA ROOM LIVE ANAHEIM, LLC ON 11/14/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY RUMBA ROOM LIVE ANAHEIM, LLC ON 11/14/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY RUMBA ROOM LIVE ANAHEIM, LLC ON 11/14/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY RUMBA ROOM LIVE ANAHEIM, LLC ON 11/14/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY RUMBA ROOM LIVE ANAHEIM, LLC ON 11/14/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY RUMBA ROOM LIVE ANAHEIM, LLC ON 11/14/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13137390 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12965478.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13137390 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12965478.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/22/2023 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C15 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/22/2023 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C15 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY RUMBA ROOM LIVE ANAHEIM, LLC ON 11/22/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY RUMBA ROOM LIVE ANAHEIM, LLC ON 11/22/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY RUMBA ROOM LIVE ANAHEIM, LLC ON 11/22/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY RUMBA ROOM LIVE ANAHEIM, LLC ON 11/22/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY RUMBA ROOM LIVE ANAHEIM, LLC ON 11/22/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY RUMBA ROOM LIVE ANAHEIM, LLC ON 11/22/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY RUMBA ROOM LIVE ANAHEIM, LLC ON 11/30/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY RUMBA ROOM LIVE ANAHEIM, LLC ON 11/30/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY RUMBA ROOM LIVE ANAHEIM, LLC ON 11/30/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY RUMBA ROOM LIVE ANAHEIM, LLC ON 11/30/2022

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2023
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: STRICKROTH; Department: C15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY RUMBA ROOM LIVE ANAHEIM, LLC ON 11/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11070538 RECEIVED ON 11/30/2022 08:52:46 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY RUMBA ROOM LIVE ANAHEIM, LLC ON 11/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31238388 RECEIVED ON 11/30/2022 08:52:46 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY RUMBA ROOM LIVE ANAHEIM, LLC ON 11/22/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21238727 RECEIVED ON 11/22/2022 11:42:17 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY RUMBA ROOM LIVE ANAHEIM, LLC ON 11/22/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11068149 RECEIVED ON 11/22/2022 11:42:17 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY RUMBA ROOM LIVE ANAHEIM, LLC ON 11/22/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31236015 RECEIVED ON 11/22/2022 11:42:16 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/22/2023 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C15 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13137390 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12965478.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41410129 RECEIVED ON 11/11/2022 03:02:01 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER STRICKROTH, MICHAEL ON 11/14/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY RUMBA ROOM LIVE ANAHEIM, LLC ON 11/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY RUMBA ROOM LIVE ANAHEIM, LLC ON 11/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY RUMBA ROOM LIVE ANAHEIM, LLC ON 11/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOUSE OF BLUES ANAHEIM RESTAURANT CORP is a litigant

Latest cases where KNIGHT PLUMBING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Rumba Room Live Anaheim LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where STC GardenWalk LLC is a litigant