This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:53:01 (UTC).

RUDY URENA VS. EARTHGRAINS DISTRIBUTION, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 RUDY URENA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against EARTHGRAINS DISTRIBUTION, LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Civil Complex Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CXC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civil Complex Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

VICTOR URENA

FRANK CONTRERAS

RUDY URENA

Defendants

EARTHGRAINS BAKING CO., INC.

EARTHGRAINS DISTRIBUTION, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

RUKIN HYLAND DORIA & TINDALL LLP

LEONARD CARDER, LLP

Defendant Attorney

MORGAN, LEWIS & BOCKIUS, LLP

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CONTRERAS, FRANK; CONTRERAS, FRANK; URENA, RUDY; URENA, RUDY; URENA, VICTOR; URENA, VICTOR ON 03/01/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CONTRERAS, FRANK; CONTRERAS, FRANK; URENA, RUDY; URENA, RUDY; URENA, VICTOR; URENA, VICTOR ON 03/01/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE, 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 2,870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11939805 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11763994.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE, 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 2,870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11939805 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11763994.

NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT FILED BY EARTHGRAINS BAKING CO., INC.; EARTHGRAINS DISTRIBUTION, LLC ON 04/05/2016

NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT FILED BY EARTHGRAINS BAKING CO., INC.; EARTHGRAINS DISTRIBUTION, LLC ON 04/05/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY URENA, RUDY; URENA, VICTOR; CONTRERAS, FRANK ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY URENA, RUDY; URENA, VICTOR; CONTRERAS, FRANK ON 02/26/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY CONTRERAS, FRANK; CONTRERAS, FRANK; URENA, RUDY; URENA, RUDY; URENA, VICTOR; URENA, VICTOR ON 03/14/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY CONTRERAS, FRANK; CONTRERAS, FRANK; URENA, RUDY; URENA, RUDY; URENA, VICTOR; URENA, VICTOR ON 03/14/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY CONTRERAS, FRANK; CONTRERAS, FRANK; URENA, RUDY; URENA, RUDY; URENA, VICTOR; URENA, VICTOR ON 03/14/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY CONTRERAS, FRANK; CONTRERAS, FRANK; URENA, RUDY; URENA, RUDY; URENA, VICTOR; URENA, VICTOR ON 03/14/2016

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11929055 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11753273.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11929055 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11753273.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER DUNNING, KIM ON 02/26/2016.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER DUNNING, KIM ON 02/26/2016.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 04/08/2016 01:41:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 04/08/2016 01:41:00 PM.

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CONTRERAS, FRANK; CONTRERAS, FRANK; URENA, RUDY; URENA, RUDY; URENA, VICTOR; URENA, VICTOR ON 03/28/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CONTRERAS, FRANK; CONTRERAS, FRANK; URENA, RUDY; URENA, RUDY; URENA, VICTOR; URENA, VICTOR ON 03/28/2016

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY EARTHGRAINS BAKING CO., INC.; EARTHGRAINS DISTRIBUTION, LLC ON 04/04/2016

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY EARTHGRAINS BAKING CO., INC.; EARTHGRAINS DISTRIBUTION, LLC ON 04/04/2016

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 03/28/2016 11:17:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 03/28/2016 11:17:00 AM.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY URENA, RUDY; URENA, VICTOR; CONTRERAS, FRANK ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY URENA, RUDY; URENA, VICTOR; CONTRERAS, FRANK ON 02/26/2016

CLASS ACTION / B 17200 QUESTIONNAIRE FILED BY CONTRERAS, FRANK; CONTRERAS, FRANK; URENA, RUDY; URENA, RUDY; URENA, VICTOR; URENA, VICTOR ON 03/28/2016

CLASS ACTION / B 17200 QUESTIONNAIRE FILED BY CONTRERAS, FRANK; CONTRERAS, FRANK; URENA, RUDY; URENA, RUDY; URENA, VICTOR; URENA, VICTOR ON 03/28/2016

PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE PURSUANT TO 170.6 CCP (JUDGE KIM G. DUNNING) FILED BY EARTHGRAINS BAKING CO., INC.; EARTHGRAINS DISTRIBUTION, LLC ON 03/21/2016

PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE PURSUANT TO 170.6 CCP (JUDGE KIM G. DUNNING) FILED BY EARTHGRAINS BAKING CO., INC.; EARTHGRAINS DISTRIBUTION, LLC ON 03/21/2016

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 04/08/2016 01:41:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • THE CASE IS REASSIGNED TO THE OMNIBUS CALENDAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • CASE REASSIGNED TO OMNI EFFECTIVE 04/08/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT FILED BY EARTHGRAINS BAKING CO., INC.; EARTHGRAINS DISTRIBUTION, LLC ON 04/05/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3399433 RECEIVED ON 04/05/2016 10:10:22 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY EARTHGRAINS BAKING CO., INC.; EARTHGRAINS DISTRIBUTION, LLC ON 04/04/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4527959 RECEIVED ON 04/04/2016 02:56:08 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CONTRERAS, FRANK; CONTRERAS, FRANK; URENA, RUDY; URENA, RUDY; URENA, VICTOR; URENA, VICTOR ON 03/28/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4524373 RECEIVED ON 03/28/2016 03:15:53 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 03/14/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1309712 RECEIVED ON 03/14/2016 12:11:01 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY CONTRERAS, FRANK; CONTRERAS, FRANK; URENA, RUDY; URENA, RUDY; URENA, VICTOR; URENA, VICTOR ON 03/14/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2450723 RECEIVED ON 03/14/2016 12:07:05 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CONTRERAS, FRANK; CONTRERAS, FRANK; URENA, RUDY; URENA, RUDY; URENA, VICTOR; URENA, VICTOR ON 03/01/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4511282 RECEIVED ON 03/01/2016 05:08:57 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER DUNNING, KIM ON 02/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11929055 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11753273.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY URENA, RUDY; URENA, VICTOR; CONTRERAS, FRANK ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY URENA, RUDY; URENA, VICTOR; CONTRERAS, FRANK ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4509918 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 05:30:55 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.