This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/29/2023 at 03:47:58 (UTC).

ROZINA BADAL MUNIR VS. ALLERGAN, INC.

Case Summary

On 02/14/2023 ROZINA BADAL MUNIR filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against ALLERGAN, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rozina Badal Munir

Defendants

Allergan Holdco U.S., Inc.

Allergan Holdings, Inc.

Allergan PLC

Allergan Sales, LLC

Allergan USA, Inc.

Allergan, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

The Law Office of Alex Farzan

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY MUNIR, ROZINA BADAL ON 02/14/2023

COMPLAINT FILED BY MUNIR, ROZINA BADAL ON 02/14/2023

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13181194 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13009321.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13181194 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13009321.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/25/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C20 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/25/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C20 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MUNIR, ROZINA BADAL ON 02/28/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MUNIR, ROZINA BADAL ON 02/28/2023

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 04/10/2023

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 04/10/2023

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ALLERGAN, INC.; ALLERGAN USA, INC. ON 04/10/2023

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ALLERGAN, INC.; ALLERGAN USA, INC. ON 04/10/2023

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ALLERGAN, INC.; ALLERGAN USA, INC. ON 04/10/2023

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ALLERGAN, INC.; ALLERGAN USA, INC. ON 04/10/2023

NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY ALLERGAN, INC.; ALLERGAN USA, INC. ON 04/10/2023

NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY ALLERGAN, INC.; ALLERGAN USA, INC. ON 04/10/2023

PROPOSED ORDER (NOT SIGNED) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 04/10/2023

PROPOSED ORDER (NOT SIGNED) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 04/10/2023

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2023
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Department: C20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31294463 RECEIVED ON 04/10/2023 04:35:21 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER (NOT SIGNED) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 04/10/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY ALLERGAN, INC.; ALLERGAN USA, INC. ON 04/10/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11126205 RECEIVED ON 04/10/2023 04:35:22 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ALLERGAN, INC.; ALLERGAN USA, INC. ON 04/10/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31294464 RECEIVED ON 04/10/2023 04:35:21 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ALLERGAN, INC.; ALLERGAN USA, INC. ON 04/10/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21297127 RECEIVED ON 04/10/2023 04:35:21 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 04/10/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21278050 RECEIVED ON 02/28/2023 09:18:13 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MUNIR, ROZINA BADAL ON 02/28/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONTINUANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 08/04/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C20 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/25/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C20 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13181194 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13009321.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11101563 RECEIVED ON 02/14/2023 09:08:35 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER LARSH, ERICK ON 02/14/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY MUNIR, ROZINA BADAL ON 02/14/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less