This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/17/2019 at 02:25:43 (UTC).

ROY E. STONE VS. SELECT EQUIPMENT SALES, INC.

Case Summary

On 05/23/2019 ROY E STONE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SELECT EQUIPMENT SALES, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Roy E. Stone

Defendants

Select Equipment Sales, Inc.

Unicarriers Americas Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

McMahon Lynch Law Firm, Inc.

Defendant Attorney

Prenovost Normandin Bergh & Dawe, APC

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY STONE, ROY E. ON 05/23/2019

COMPLAINT FILED BY STONE, ROY E. ON 05/23/2019

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY STONE, ROY E. ON 05/23/2019

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY STONE, ROY E. ON 05/23/2019

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY STONE, ROY E. ON 05/23/2019

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY STONE, ROY E. ON 05/23/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12559513 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12383392.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12559513 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12383392.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HOFFER, DAVID ON 05/23/2019.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HOFFER, DAVID ON 05/23/2019.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/22/2019 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C42 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/22/2019 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C42 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

ANSWER (GENERAL DENIAL) FILED BY SELECT EQUIPMENT SALES, INC. ON 08/15/2019

ANSWER (GENERAL DENIAL) FILED BY SELECT EQUIPMENT SALES, INC. ON 08/15/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12605251 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12429509.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12605251 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12429509.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12605251 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12429509.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER (GENERAL DENIAL) FILED BY SELECT EQUIPMENT SALES, INC. ON 08/15/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41001968 RECEIVED ON 08/15/2019 12:18:36 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/22/2019 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C42 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HOFFER, DAVID ON 05/23/2019.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12559513 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12383392.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY STONE, ROY E. ON 05/23/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY STONE, ROY E. ON 05/23/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY STONE, ROY E. ON 05/23/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2797946 RECEIVED ON 05/23/2019 12:39:45 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less